Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1612363

EP1612363 - Automatic sliding door system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.11.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
04.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEZE GmbH
Reinhold-Vöster-Straße 21-29
71229 Leonberg / DE
[2014/01]
Former [2006/01]For all designated states
GEZE GmbH
Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29
71229 Leonberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hucker, Matthias Dr.
Lorenzstrasse 20
76359 Marxzell / DE
 [2006/01]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date05013288.521.06.2005
[2006/01]
Priority number, dateDE2004103189730.06.2004         Original published format: DE102004031897
[2006/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1612363
Date:04.01.2006
Language:DE
[2006/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1612363
Date:23.09.2009
[2009/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1612363
Date:01.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:E05F15/632, E05F15/40, E05F15/73, // E05F15/72
[2016/51]
Former International [2006/01]E05F15/14, E05F15/20, E05F15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/01]
TitleGerman:Automatische Schiebetüranlage[2006/01]
English:Automatic sliding door system[2006/01]
French:Ensemble de porte coulissante automatique[2006/01]
Examination procedure18.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/17]
26.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2013Fee for grant paid
19.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.05.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.09.2014  04.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
dormakaba Deutschland GmbH
Dorma Platz 1
58256 Ennepetal / DE
Opponent's representative
Balder IP Law, S.L.
Paseo de la Castellana 93
5ª planta
28046 Madrid / ES
 02  04.09.2014  04.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Agtatec ag
Allmendstr. 24
8320 Fehraltorf / CH
Opponent's representative
Flach Bauer Stahl Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Adlzreiterstraße 11
83022 Rosenheim / DE
 [2018/33]
Former [2017/28]
Opponent(s)01  02.09.2014  04.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
dormakaba Deutschland GmbH
Dorma Platz 1
58256 Ennepetal / DE
Opponent's representative
Balder IP Law, S.L.
Paseo de la Castellana 93
28046 Madrid / ES
 02  04.09.2014  04.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Agtatec ag
Allmendstr. 24
8320 Fehraltorf / CH
Opponent's representative
Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul
Andrae l Westendorp
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Adlzreiterstrasse 11
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Former [2014/42]
Opponent(s)01  02.09.2014   
Dorma Deutschland GmbH
Postfach 4009
58247 Ennepetal / DE
Opponent's representative
Vanek, Volker
Dorma GmbH & Co. KG
Group Recht/Versicherungen/Schutzrechte
Dorma Platz 1
DE-58256 Ennepetal / DE
 02  04.09.2014   
Agtatec ag
Allmendstr. 24
8320 Fehraltorf / CH
Opponent's representative
Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul
Andrae l Westendorp
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Adlzreiterstrasse 11
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Former [2014/41]
Opponent(s)01  02.09.2014   
Dorma Deutschland GmbH
Postfach 4009
58247 Ennepetal / DE
Opponent's representative
Vanek, Volker
Dorma GmbH & Co. KG
Group Recht/Versicherungen/Schutzrechte
Dorma Platz 1
DE-58256 Ennepetal / DE
11.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition01.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0290/17
28.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0290/17
06.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.06.2005
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
TR01.01.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
IE21.06.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU21.06.2005
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
IE21.06.2014
Former [2016/28]BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
IE21.06.2014
Former [2016/25]BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
IE21.06.2014
Former [2015/24]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
IE21.06.2014
Former [2015/21]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
IE21.06.2014
Former [2015/09]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/50]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/49]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/37]CY01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE3202784  (KIEKERT GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 3, lines 1,8-12 * * page 4, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 5, lines 14-19 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * figure 2 * [Y] 2,3;
 [Y]DE19653026  (GEZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 12 * * column 6, lines 24-28 * * column 7, lines 2-7 * * figures 3,8 *
by applicantDE3202784
 DE3940762