Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1612363


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.11.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
04.11.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.07.2018 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
09.06.2017 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
31.03.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
18.02.2017 New entry: Appeal number
18.02.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
03.02.2017 Change: Appeal number
01.02.2017 New entry: Appeal number
01.02.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
01.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
01.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.11.2016 Change - classification published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
25.11.2016 Change - classification published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Change - classification published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
18.11.2016 Change - classification published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
03.04.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
02.06.2015 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
17.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
26.03.2015 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
23.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
11.11.2014 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
16.10.2014 Change - representative
12.09.2014 Opposition filed published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
05.09.2014 Opposition filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
29.11.2013 (Expected) grant published on  01.01.2014  [2014/01]
22.11.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.11.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.08.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.06.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.09.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.05.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.04.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.08.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.06.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.04.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.09.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.07.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.05.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.05.2010 First examination report
23.04.2010 Definitive list of designations published on  26.05.2010  [2010/21]
26.03.2010 Request for examination filed published on  28.04.2010  [2010/17]
21.08.2009 Publication of search report published on  23.09.2009  [2009/39]
20.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.06.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.06.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.11.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.01.2006  [2006/01]