Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1742157

EP1742157 - Database system, method and active repository [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.11.2009
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/02]For all designated states
SOFTWARE AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schöning, Harald
Theobaldstr. 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
 [2007/02]
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2007/02]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date05014454.204.07.2005
[2007/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1742157
Date:10.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1742157
Date:21.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2007/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/02]
TitleGerman:Datenbanksystem , Verfahren und aktive Ablage[2007/02]
English:Database system, method and active repository[2007/02]
French:Système de base de données, méthode et référentiel actif[2007/02]
Examination procedure24.01.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2006Examination requested  [2007/02]
25.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2008Date of oral proceedings
28.10.2008Date of oral proceedings
12.11.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2008Fee for grant paid
26.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200703   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CY21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
IT21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
TR21.01.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
IE04.07.2009
LU04.07.2009
HU22.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
IT21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
IE04.07.2009
LU04.07.2009
HU22.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2011/21]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
IT21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
IE04.07.2009
LU04.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2011/15]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
IT21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
IE04.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/51]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
IE04.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/36]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
IE04.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/23]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/11]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2009/51]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
RO21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2009/46]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2009/45]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2009/41]AT21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
LV21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
PL21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
IS21.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2009/36]FI21.01.2009
LT21.01.2009
NL21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
ES02.05.2009
Former [2009/27]NL21.01.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]US6049664  (DALE GEOFFREY W [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 4, line 57 - column 7, line 31; figure 3 *;
 [A]US2004015476  (TWADDLE GRAHAM KENNEDY [GB]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0067]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0072]; figure 7 *;
 [X]  ANONYMOUS, "Unify NXJ 10.5", (2004), URL: http://www.unify.com/downloads/pdfs/NXJ_105_DataSheet.pdf, (20050812), XP002340661 [X] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [A]  ANONYMOUS, "Above All Launches Offering, Lands Funding", (20040217), URL: http://www.ebizq.net/news/3791.html?&pp=1, (20050815), XP002340662 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *