Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1617437

EP1617437 - Phase change memory device and programming and controlling methods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2014
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.03.2014  [2014/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/39]
Former [2006/03]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd
416 Maetan 3-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Cho, Baek-Hyung
Unam Jugong Apt. 310-603
779-1, Busan-dong
Osan-si Gyeonggi-do, 447-050 / KR
02 / Kim, Du-Eung Jinsan Maeul Samsung Apt., 516-1004
1168, Pungduckchun-ri
Suji-eup
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-846 / KR
03 / Cho, Woo-Yeong Salgugol Jindeok Apt. 703-703
Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-736 / KR
 [2013/12]
Former [2006/06]01 / Cho, Baek-Hyung
Unam Jugong Apt. 310-603 779-1, Busan-dong
Osan-si Gyeonggi-do, 447-050 / KR
02 / Kim, Du-Eung Jinsan Maeul Samsung Apt., 516-1004
1168, Pungduckchun-ri Suji-eup
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-846 / KR
03 / Cho, Woo-Yeong Salgugol Jindeok Apt. 703-703
Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-736 / KR
Former [2006/03]01 / Cho, Baek-Hyung
Unam Jugong Apt. 310-603 779-1, Busan-dong
Osan-si Gyeonggi-do, 447-050 / KR
02 / Kim, Du-Eung Jinsan Maeul Samsung Apt., 516-1004
1168, Pungduckchun-ri Suji-eup
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-846 / KR
03 / Cho, Woo-Yeong
Hyundai Apt. 211-1103 New-Yeongtong Banwal-ri
Taean-eup Hwasung-si Gyeonggi-do 445-973 / KR
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Kronenstrasse 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/12]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Kronenstrasse 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2006/03]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Kronenstrasse 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date05014605.906.07.2005
[2006/03]
Priority number, dateKR2004005334609.07.2004         Original published format: KR 2004053346
US2005007455708.03.2005         Original published format: US 74557
[2006/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1617437
Date:18.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1617437
Date:20.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:G11C13/00
[2012/38]
Former International [2006/03]G11C16/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/38]
Former [2006/03]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Phasenwechselspeicher sowie Programmier- und Betriebsverfahren[2006/03]
English:Phase change memory device and programming and controlling methods[2006/03]
French:Mémoire à changement de phase et méthode de programmation et de contrôle[2006/03]
Examination procedure06.05.2006Examination requested  [2006/25]
26.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2006Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.11.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
22.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2013Fee for grant paid
05.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.06.2006
Opposition(s)02.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
24.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.08.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006BG   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006CZ   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006EE   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006HU   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006IS   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006LT   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006LV   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006PL   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006RO   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006SI   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006SK   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT20.03.2013
[2014/11]
Documents cited:Search[X]US6480438  (PARK EUNGJOON [US]) [X] 1-3,7-10,14,19,22,24,25,27 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2004022085  (PARKINSON WARD D [US], et al) [A] 12 * paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *