Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1624322

EP1624322 - Optical sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.08.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.11.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leuze electronic GmbH + Co KG
In der Braike 1
73277 Owen/Teck / DE
[2006/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Droemer, Jörg
Am Hockenloch 49
72574 Bad Urach-Wittlingen / DE
 [2006/06]
Representative(s)Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard
Patentanwalt
Jurastrasse 1
73087 Bad Boll / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/39]Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard
Fabrikstrasse 18
73277 Owen/Teck / DE
Former [2006/06]Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard
Fabrikstrasse 18
73277 Owen/Teck / DE
Application number, filing date05016032.423.07.2005
[2006/06]
Priority number, dateDE2004103825706.08.2004         Original published format: DE102004038257
[2006/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1624322
Date:08.02.2006
Language:DE
[2006/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1624322
Date:28.09.2011
Language:DE
[2011/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:G01V8/10
[2006/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2011/37]
Former [2006/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Optischer Sensor[2006/06]
English:Optical sensor[2006/06]
French:Capteur optique[2006/06]
Examination procedure16.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/06]
24.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2011Fee for grant paid
05.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.03.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.03.2012   
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
Opponent's representative
Hehl, Ulrich
SICK AG Intellectual Property Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
 [2012/16]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
02.08.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.11.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
28.10.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2014
12.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
18.02.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition21.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0602/15
21.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
22.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.07.2013
GB23.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
[2014/24]
Former [2014/21]GB23.07.2013
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE10021590  (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, line 50 - line 63; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE20111588U  (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * page 6, line 6 - line 12; figure 2a *;
 [Y]US4115701  (GUICHARD ROBERT C) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, line 34 - line 65; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE4215272  (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1,12 * abstract *;
 [Y]JPS619601  ;
 [Y]GB626530  (PHILIPS NV) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 75 - line 90 *;
 [Y]EP0384353  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [Y] 1,6-8 * figures 3b,3c *;
 [Y]US4948447  (CLARKE LOUIS G [US], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860604), vol. 010, no. 154, Database accession no. (P - 463), & JP61009601 A 19860117 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *
by applicantDE19850270