Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1650306

EP1650306 - Means and methods for modifying gene expression using unpolyadenylated RNA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.05.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
07.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Black Mountain Science and Innovation Park
Clunies Ross Street
Acton ACT 2601 / AU
[2016/33]
Former [2009/02]For all designated states
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU
Former [2006/17]For all designated states
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2601 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Wang, Ming-Bo
3/14 Masson Street
Turner, Canberra ACT 2612 / AU
02 / Waterhouse, Peter
5 Banjine Street
O'Connor ACT 2602 / AU
 [2006/24]
Former [2006/17]01 / Wang, Ming-Bo
3/14 Masson Street
Turner, Canberra ACT 2612 / AU
02 / Waterhouse, Peter
O'Connor
Canberra, ACT 2602 / AU
Representative(s)Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2012/23]
Former [2006/17]Almond-Martin, Carol
ERNEST GUTMANN - YVES PLASSERAUD S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Application number, filing date05016726.114.08.2000
[2006/17]
Priority number, dateUS1999037372013.08.1999         Original published format: US 373720
[2006/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1650306
Date:26.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1650306
Date:03.05.2006
[2006/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1650306
Date:06.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/63, C12N15/82
[2006/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2006/17]
TitleGerman:MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERÄNDERUNG DER GENEXPRESSION MITTELS & xA; NICHT-POLYADENYLIERTER RNA[2015/45]
English:Means and methods for modifying gene expression using unpolyadenylated RNA[2006/17]
French:MOYENS ET METHODES DE MODIFICATION DE L'EXPRESSION GENIQUE A L'AIDE & xA; D'UN ARN POLYADENYLE[2015/45]
Former [2006/17]Mittel und Verfahren zur Veränderung der Genexpression mittels nicht-polyadenylierter RNA
Former [2006/17]Moyens et méthodes de modification de l'expression génique à l'aide d'un ARN polyadenylé
Examination procedure30.10.2006Examination requested  [2006/50]
01.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2012Fee for grant paid
19.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00953352.2  / EP1208211
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000953352) is  14.09.2005
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.03.2013  07.03.2013  WITHDRAWN
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
 02  05.03.2013  11.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe
Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2017/10]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.2013  07.03.2013  WITHDRAWN
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
 02  05.03.2013  11.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe
Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2016/09]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.2013  07.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
 02  05.03.2013  11.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe
Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2016/08]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.2013  07.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Piening, Niklas
BASF SE
GVX/B - C6
Carl-Bosch-Straße 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  05.03.2013  11.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe
Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/37]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.2013  07.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Piening, Niklas
BASF SE
GVX/B - C6
Carl-Bosch-Straße 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  05.03.2013  11.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/15]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.2013  07.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Piening, Niklas
BASF SE
GVX/B - C6
Carl-Bosch-Straße 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 02  05.03.2013   
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Wainwright, Jane Helen
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
11.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.10.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.06.2015Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
23.07.2015Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
11.08.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.10.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition09.12.2015Appeal received No.  T2261/15
08.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
23.12.2015Appeal received No.  T2261/15
03.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
02.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:28.09.2007Request for further processing filed
28.09.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.10.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
02.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
02.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.06.2012
MC31.08.2012
[2015/21]
Former [2012/49]CY06.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9515394  (UNIVERSITY OF CONNECTICUT) [A] 1-39 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - LIU Z ET AL, "NUCLEAR ANTISENSE RNA AN EFFICIENT NEW METHOD TO INHIBIT GENE EXPRESSION", MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, TOTOWA, NJ, US, (1994), vol. 2, ISSN 1073-6085, pages 107 - 118, XP000573604 [A] 1-39 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02824803
 [A]  - LIU Z ET AL, "TARGETED NUCLEAR ANTISENSE RNA MIMICS NATURAL ANTISENSE-INDUCED DEGRADATION OF POLYOMA VIRUS EARLY RNA", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199405), vol. 91, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4258 - 4262, XP001074190 [A] 1-39 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.10.4258
 [A]  - DONAHUE C P ET AL, "KINETICS OF HAIRPIN RIBOZYME CLEAVAGE IN YEAST", RNA, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (1997), vol. 3, ISSN 1355-8382, pages 961 - 973, XP001095939 [A] 1-39 * the whole document *
 [A]  - WELCH P J ET AL, "EXPRESSION OF RIBOZYMES IN GENE TRANSFER SYSTEMS TO MODULATE TARGET RNA LEVELS", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (199810), vol. 9, no. 5, ISSN 0958-1669, pages 486 - 496, XP001015434 [A] 1-39 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(98)80034-7