blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1627723

EP1627723 - Device for exchanging the cylinder of an extruder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2014
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leistritz Extrusionstechnik GmbH
Markgrafenstrasse 29-39
90459 Nürnberg / DE
[2011/23]
Former [2006/16]For all designated states
Leistritz Aktiengesellschaft
Markgrafenstrasse 29-39
90459 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2006/08]For all designated states
Leistritz Extrusionstechnik GmbH
Markgrafenstrasse 29 - 39
90459 Nürnberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Steiner, Richard
Kernmühle 2
90574 Rosstal / DE
 [2006/08]
Representative(s)Blaumeier, Jörg
Lindner Blaumeier
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Blaumeier, Jörg
LINDNER I BLAUMEIER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2006/08]Blaumeier, Jörg
LINDNER BLAUMEIER & KOLLEGEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date05017472.111.08.2005
[2006/08]
Priority number, dateDE2004104018619.08.2004         Original published format: DE102004040186
[2006/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1627723
Date:22.02.2006
Language:DE
[2006/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1627723
Date:07.11.2007
[2007/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1627723
Date:18.12.2013
Language:DE
[2013/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2007
ClassificationIPC:B29C47/66
[2013/38]
CPC:
B29C48/68 (EP,US); B29C48/256 (EP,US); B29C48/2562 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2006/08]B29C47/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/08]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zum Wechseln eines Extrusionszylinder eines Extruders[2006/08]
English:Device for exchanging the cylinder of an extruder[2006/08]
French:Dispositif pour échanger le cylindre à vis d'une extrudeuse[2006/08]
Examination procedure26.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/24]
10.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2013Fee for grant paid
05.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10004842.0  / EP2251178
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.06.2008
Opposition(s)19.09.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
03.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
16.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
15.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
15.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
01.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.08.2005
BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
TR18.12.2013
GR19.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
AT11.08.2014
GB11.08.2014
IE11.08.2014
IT11.08.2014
LU11.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU11.08.2005
BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
GR19.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
AT11.08.2014
GB11.08.2014
IE11.08.2014
IT11.08.2014
LU11.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2016/28]BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
GR19.03.2014
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
AT11.08.2014
GB11.08.2014
IE11.08.2014
IT11.08.2014
LU11.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2016/25]BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
AT11.08.2014
GB11.08.2014
IE11.08.2014
IT11.08.2014
LU11.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2015/51]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
AT11.08.2014
GB11.08.2014
IE11.08.2014
IT11.08.2014
LU11.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2015/38]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
GB11.08.2014
IE11.08.2014
IT11.08.2014
LU11.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2015/37]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
GB11.08.2014
IE11.08.2014
IT11.08.2014
LU11.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/36]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
GB11.08.2014
IT11.08.2014
LU11.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/24]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
IT11.08.2014
LU11.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/23]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
IT11.08.2014
LU11.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/20]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
LU11.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/19]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
LU11.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
Former [2015/18]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2014/48]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
DK18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2014/39]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
NL18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2014/37]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
ES18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
PL18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
PT18.04.2014
Former [2014/36]EE18.12.2013
FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
Former [2014/25]FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
Former [2014/22]FI18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
SE18.12.2013
Former [2014/20]LT18.12.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2654774  (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) [A] 1* page 19, line 18 - line 24; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]JPS5777541  (HISHIYA SEIKOU KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS58187323  (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [A] 1-4,15 * figure - *;
 [YA]US4778370  (HEINDL FRIEDRICH [AT], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 27 * * column 2, line 22 - line 33 * * column 3, line 11 - line 25 * * claims 1-6,15 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 5-23;
 [YA]DE29506094U  (UNITEK MASCHNB & HANDEL GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1-4 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 10 * * page 6, line 22 - page 9, line 2 * * figure -; claim - * [A] 5-23;
 [A]US5498380  (SASAKI BEJI [JP]) [A] 1-23 * figure -; claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.