blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1627787 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1627787



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 723
14.09.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
14.09.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
08.09.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
29.08.2017 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
29.08.2017 French translation of claims Opposition 2
29.08.2017 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
29.08.2017 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
27.06.2017 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
27.06.2017 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
06.06.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
18.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.05.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
16.05.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.05.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 17
11.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
21.03.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
21.03.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
21.03.2017 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
08.03.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
27.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.02.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
17.02.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
17.02.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
17.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
14.02.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.02.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
19.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.01.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
07.11.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
07.11.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
28.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.10.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
20.10.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.10.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
18.10.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
12.10.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.08.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
13.08.2015 Claims Appeal 3
13.08.2015 Claims Appeal 3
13.08.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 26
13.08.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
12.08.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 26
16.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.06.2015 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
15.06.2015 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
15.06.2015 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
11.06.2015 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
07.05.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.02.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
05.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.02.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
05.02.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.02.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
05.02.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
05.02.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
05.02.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
05.02.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
01.12.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
01.12.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
25.11.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.11.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
10.10.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.09.2014 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
25.09.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
25.09.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
25.09.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 17
25.09.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 24
25.09.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.09.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.09.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.09.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
25.09.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Description Opposition 7
02.05.2014 Description Opposition 7
02.05.2014 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
24.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
24.04.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.04.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 7
11.04.2014 Description Opposition 7
11.04.2014 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
21.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
21.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
21.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
21.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
21.02.2014 Claims Opposition 3
21.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
21.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
21.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
20.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
20.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
20.02.2014 Claims Opposition 4
20.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
20.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
20.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
20.02.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
28.01.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.01.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
31.10.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.10.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.10.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2013 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
20.01.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Opposition 1
04.01.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
04.01.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
22.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.04.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.04.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2009 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
15.12.2009 Claims Opposition 4
15.12.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
14.12.2009 Claims Opposition 4
14.12.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
02.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
27.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.10.2009 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
22.10.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.10.2009 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
20.10.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 3
19.10.2009 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
19.10.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.06.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.06.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
20.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
20.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
20.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
20.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
13.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
13.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
13.05.2009 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
13.08.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.07.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.05.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.05.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
31.05.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.05.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.05.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
30.05.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.05.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.01.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
22.01.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
22.01.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
11.11.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
11.11.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.11.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
10.11.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.11.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.08.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
31.07.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.02.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
09.02.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.12.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.12.2005 European search opinion Search / examination 4
06.12.2005 European search report Search / examination 2
14.11.2005 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
02.11.2005 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
29.09.2005 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2005 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
29.09.2005 Priority document Search / examination 29
22.08.2005 Annex Search / examination 18
22.08.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
16.08.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
16.08.2005 Description Search / examination 8
16.08.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.08.2005 Drawings Search / examination 7
16.08.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6