Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1627827

EP1627827 - Package for transporting and storing horn-shaped bakery goods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.01.2010  [2010/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
hvb Innova AG
Grabenstrasse 21
8213 Neunkirch / CH
[2006/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Heist, Henri
Oberwiesstrasse 26
8213 Neunkirch / CH
 [2006/08]
Representative(s)Grommes, Karl F.
Mehlgasse 14-16
56068 Koblenz / DE
[2006/08]
Application number, filing date05017843.317.08.2005
[2006/08]
Priority number, dateDE20042013050U19.08.2004         Original published format: DE 202004013050 U
[2006/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1627827
Date:22.02.2006
Language:DE
[2006/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1627827
Date:28.02.2007
[2007/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1627827
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:B65D85/36, B65D81/02
[2006/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/44]
Former [2006/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verpackung zum Transport und zur Lagerung von hörnchenförmigen Gebäckteilen[2006/08]
English:Package for transporting and storing horn-shaped bakery goods[2006/08]
French:Emballage pour le transport et le stockage des produits de pâtisserie en forme de cornet[2006/08]
Examination procedure31.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/37]
04.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2008Fee for grant paid
13.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200804   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]US5085879  (ELBAZ GABRIEL [CA]) [X] 1-9 * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]FR2752824  (CUSTOMAGIC EUROP [FR]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5899353  (SABIN JEFFREY MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 3 *