blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1672375

EP1672375 - Electricity meter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.05.2014
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, HU, LU
published on 26.08.2015  [2015/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EMH metering GmbH & Co. KG
Südring 5
19243 Wittenburg / DE
[2010/38]
Former [2006/25]For all designated states
EMH Elektrizitätszähler GmbH & Co KG
Südring 5
19243 Wittenburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Malek, Norbert
Thieshoper Grund 8
21438 Thieshope / DE
 [2006/25]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/28]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2008/37]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2006/25]Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons
Neuer Wall 41
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date05017934.018.08.2005
[2006/25]
Priority number, dateDE20042019570U18.12.2004         Original published format: DE 202004019570 U
[2006/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1672375
Date:21.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1672375
Date:10.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2006
ClassificationIPC:G01R22/06
[2013/09]
CPC:
G01R22/066 (EP)
Former IPC [2006/25]G01R11/25
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/25]
TitleGerman:Elektrizitätszähler[2006/25]
English:Electricity meter[2006/25]
French:Compteur d'électricité[2006/25]
Examination procedure23.06.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/31]
12.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2013Date of oral proceedings
19.02.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2013Fee for grant paid
18.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.03.2010
Opposition(s)11.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
19.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
09.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
21.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.08.2005
BG10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
TR10.07.2013
AT18.08.2013
IE18.08.2013
LU18.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GB10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
TR10.07.2013
AT18.08.2013
IE18.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GB10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/51]CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
AT18.08.2013
IE18.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GB10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/34]CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
IE18.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GB10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/33]CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
IE18.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/26]CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/24]CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/23]CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/22]CY10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/21]CY10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/20]CY10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/14]CY10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/12]CY10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/11]CY10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/10]CY10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/09]LT10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2013/49]SI10.07.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0447615  (LANDIS & GYR BETRIEBS AG [CH]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]US5523559  (SWANSON SCOTT C [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 44 - line 52; figures 1-6 * * abstract *;
 [A]WO9709623  (ELGSTROEM MIKAEL [SE], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 4; figures 2-4 * * abstract *;
 [A]US6236197  (HOLDSCLAW SCOTT T [US], et al) [A] 1,2* abstract *;
 [A]DE202004000858U  (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP1607752  (ENEL DISTRIBUZIONE SPA [IT]) [E] 1-8 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP1065508
 US2002186000
    - "EHZ VDN-LASTENHEFT ELEKTRONISCHE HAUSHALTSZAEHLER", VDN - LASTENHEFT ELEKTRONISCHE HAUSHALTSZAEHLER, XX, XX, (20040620), vol. V1.01, pages 1 - 41, XP007900451
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.