Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1637592 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 188
15.09.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 2
08.08.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.07.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
19.07.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.06.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
18.01.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.01.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.01.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.11.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.11.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.07.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
11.07.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
19.02.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 3
15.09.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.08.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 General authorisation Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
21.08.2014 General authorisation Search / examination 2
21.08.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
04.04.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.03.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
10.03.2014 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
29.07.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
29.12.2006 Refund order search fee Search / examination 2
21.12.2006 Staying of examination/opposition proceedings Search / examination 1
08.12.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.12.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.10.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.09.2006 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
14.09.2006 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
21.07.2006 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.02.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
30.01.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.01.2006 European search opinion Search / examination 8
30.01.2006 European search report Search / examination 3
11.01.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.01.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
03.01.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
18.08.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 5
18.08.2005 Description Search / examination 40
18.08.2005 Drawings Search / examination 8
18.08.2005 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
18.08.2005 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7
10.03.2005 Priority document Search / examination 51