Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1637592


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.08.2017 Change - representative
15.06.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
13.01.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2014 Change - representative published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
14.03.2014 Change - representative published on  16.04.2014  [2014/16]
14.03.2014 Change - representative published on  16.04.2014  [2014/16]
04.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.12.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.01.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.01.2010 Change: Renewal fee paid
05.01.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.01.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2007 Change: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.12.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.12.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.10.2006 Definitive list of designations published on  29.11.2006  [2006/48]
13.10.2006 First examination report published on  15.11.2006  [2006/46]
10.10.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.09.2006 Request for examination filed published on  25.10.2006  [2006/43]
03.02.2006 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.03.2006  [2006/12]
30.08.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid