Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1637592

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
CY 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
Examination procedure16.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
06.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
10.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
18.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
22.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
22.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
20.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 16
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 17
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 18
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 19
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:22.03.2006 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:
Ref Document Number:1040185
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:22.03.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20060914
 
Event date:15.11.2006 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20061012
 
Event date:29.11.2006 
Event description:PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:25.10.2017 
Event description:DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20170523