Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1637592

EP1637592 - Neuronal progenitor cells, methods to produce them and uses thereof for the therapy of neural defects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Database last updated on 20.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2017Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brüstle, Oliver, Prof. Dr.
c/o Institut für Rekonstruktive Neurobiologie Universität Bonn Sigmund-Freud-Strasse 25
53127 Bonn / DE
[2006/12]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2006/12]
Representative(s)Sattler de Sousa e Brito, Clara , et al
Arroba-IP
Maximilianstrasse 29
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Sattler de Sousa e Brito, Clara
Zwicker Schnappauf & Partner
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
Former [2014/16]Sattler de Sousa e Brito, Clara
Liermann - Castell
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Willi-Bleicher-Straße 7
52353 Düren / DE
Former [2006/12]Grund, Martin , et al
GRUND Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
Application number, filing date05017964.718.12.1998
[2006/12]
Priority number, dateDE199715686419.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19756864
[2006/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1637592
Date:22.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP30.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/08, C12N5/10, A61K35/30, A61K48/00
[2006/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2006/12]
TitleGerman:Neurale Vorläuferzellen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung zur Therapie von neuralen Defekten[2006/12]
English:Neuronal progenitor cells, methods to produce them and uses thereof for the therapy of neural defects[2006/12]
French:Cellules précurseurs neurales, leur procédé de production et leur utilisation pour la thérapie d'anomalies neurales[2006/12]
Examination procedure14.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/43]
12.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10)
16.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98966817.3  / EP1040185
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980966817) is  20.11.2000
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
06.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
10.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
18.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
22.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
22.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
20.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 16
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 17
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 18
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 19
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9702049  (UNIV EMORY [US]) [X] 1-3,18,23,31-38 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9716534  (GENENTECH INC [US]) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9512665  (DIACRIN INC [US]) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *;
 [DA]  OKABE S ET AL, "Development of neuronal precursor cells and functional postmitotic neurons from embryonic stem cells in vitro.", MECHANISMS OF DEVELOPMENT, (1996 SEP) 59 (1) 89-102, (199609), XP002105103 [DA] 1-38 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-4773(96)00572-2
 [A]  OSTENFELD T ET AL, "RECENT ADVANCES IN STEM CELL NEUROBIOLOGY", ADVANCES AND TECHNICAL STANDARDS IN NEUROSURGERY, SPRINGER VERLAG, NEW YORK, NY, US, (2003), vol. 28, ISSN 0095-4829, pages 3 - 89, XP009009717
 [PA]  THOMSON J A ET AL, "EMBRYONIC STEN CELL LUNES DERIVED FROM HUMAN BLASTOCYSTS", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19981106), vol. 282, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1145 - 1147, XP002121340

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.282.5391.1145
 [PX]  BRUSTLE O ET AL, "In vitro-generated neural precursors participate in mammalian brain development.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (19971223), vol. 94, pages 14809 - 14814, XP002105104 [PX] 1,18,23,31-38 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.26.14809