Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1629769

EP1629769 - Portable electrocardiograph and processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.04.2011  [2011/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd.
24, Yamanouchi, Yamanoshita-cho, Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
[2009/03]
Former [2006/09]For all designated states
Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd.
24, Yamanouchi, Yamanoshita-cho, Ukyou-ku, Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Moroki, Yoko c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd
24, Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
02 / Yamamoto, Norihito c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd
24, Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
03 / Ishida, Junichi c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd
24, Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
04 / Tanabe, Kazuhisa c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd
24, Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
05 / Umeda, Masahiro c/o Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd
24, Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP
 [2006/09]
Representative(s)Kilian, Helmut
Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner
Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/09]Kilian, Helmut
Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date05018415.924.08.2005
[2006/09]
Priority number, dateJP2004024880727.08.2004         Original published format: JP 2004248807
[2006/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1629769
Date:01.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1629769
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/0404
[2006/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/45]
Former [2006/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tragbarer Elektrokardiograph sowie Verfahren zur Anwendung[2006/09]
English:Portable electrocardiograph and processing method[2006/09]
French:Electrocardiographe portable et méthode de traitement des signaux ECG associés.[2008/21]
Former [2006/09]Electrocardiographe portable et méthode de traitement.
Examination procedure30.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/21]
05.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2006Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.12.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
11.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2008Fee for grant paid
21.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.10.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006BG   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006CZ   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006EE   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006HU   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006IS   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006LT   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006LV   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006PL   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006RO   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006SI   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006SK   M01   Not yet paid
09.10.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT11.02.2009
ES22.05.2009
GB24.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
[2011/15]
Former [2011/01]ES22.05.2009
GB24.08.2009
FR31.08.2009
Former [2010/36]ES22.05.2009
FR31.08.2009
Former [2009/45]ES22.05.2009
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO8706447  (CERNJAVIC DRAGO, et al) [Y] 1,6 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * page 1, lines 9-21 * * page 2, line 28 * * page 3, lines 1-6 * * page 7, lines 11-16 * [A] 2-5;
 [YA]WO02096287  (CARDIOCOM AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1,6 * figure 11 * * page 13, lines 23-32 * [A] 2-5;
 [A]WO2004034902  (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [A] 2-5 * the whole document *;
 []EP1552786  (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [ ] * the whole document *;
 [A]US6038469  (KARLSSON PER [SE], et al) [A] 2-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003013978  (SCHLEGEL TODD T [US], et al) [A] 2-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2001070267
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, [A] 2-5 * the whole document *