Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1640160

EP1640160 - Electrode for a rotary printing machine and an electrostatic printing aid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/13]Electrod for a rotary printing machine and an electrostatic printing aid
[2015/49]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, HU
published on 18.07.2018  [2018/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dettke, Christa
Sandfuhrtsmoor 8
22946 Trittau / DE
For all designated states
Dettke, Christoph
Sandfuhrtsmoor 8
22946 Trittau / DE
For all designated states
Dettke, Hubertus
Sandfuhrtsmoor 8
22946 Trittau / DE
[2016/16]
Former [2016/10]For all designated states
Dettke, Christa
Sandfuhrtsmoor 2
22946 Trittau / DE
For all designated states
Dettke, Christoph
Sandfuhrtsmoor 2
22946 Trittau / DE
For all designated states
Dettke, Hubertus
Sandfuhrtsmoor 2
22946 Trittau / DE
Former [2006/13]For all designated states
Dettke, Christa
Sandfuhrtsmoor 2
22946 Trittau / DE
For all designated states
Dettke, Christoph
Sandfurthsmoor 2
22946 Trittau / DE
For all designated states
Dettke, Hubertus
Sandfurthsmoor 2
22946 Trittau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2006/13]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[2016/10]
Former [2008/37]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2006/13]Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons
Neuer Wall 41
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date05018645.127.08.2005
[2006/13]
Priority number, dateDE20042014952U25.09.2004         Original published format: DE 202004014952 U
[2006/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1640160
Date:29.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1640160
Date:09.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:B41F9/00, H01T19/04
[2006/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/10]
Former [2006/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektrode für eine Rotationsdruckmaschine und elektrostatische Druckhilfe[2006/13]
English:Electrode for a rotary printing machine and an electrostatic printing aid[2015/49]
French:Électrode pour une machine d'impression rotative et un dispositif auxiliaire électrostatique d'impression[2006/13]
Former [2006/13]Electrod for a rotary printing machine and an electrostatic printing aid
Examination procedure12.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/43]
16.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
26.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2016Fee for grant paid
05.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2006
Opposition(s)12.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
27.05.2014Request for further processing filed
27.05.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.06.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
19.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
18.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
05.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
05.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
06.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.08.2005
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
IE27.08.2016
LU27.08.2016
[2018/28]
Former [2017/37]CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
IE27.08.2016
LU27.08.2016
Former [2017/23]CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/19]CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/51]CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/39]FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]US5592357  (RADER MARK S [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0778502  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [Y] 1-7,11-16 * column 2, lines 18-27 *;
 [Y]US2003066443  (DOPPLER ALFRED [CH]) [Y] 1-7,11-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPS61213870  ;
 [X]US4725731  (LANG JOSEPH H [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 65-68 * * column 2, lines 1-24,39,40,67,68 * * column 3 *;
 [X]JPH08171254  ;
 [A]US5488222  (GAULT MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH09197766
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870210), vol. 011, no. 045, Database accession no. (P - 546), [X] 1,11 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, [X] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, [A] 1 * abstract *