blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1671529

EP1671529 - Combine harvester [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 01.07.2020  [2020/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH
Mühlenwinkel 1
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
[2016/48]
Former [2006/25]For all designated states
CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH
Münsterstr. 33
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dammann, Ludwig
Kölkebecker Strasse 8
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
 [2006/25]
Application number, filing date05021487.330.09.2005
[2006/25]
Priority number, dateDE2004106143917.12.2004         Original published format: DE102004061439
[2006/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1671529
Date:21.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1671529
Date:26.04.2017
Language:DE
[2017/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2006
ClassificationIPC:A01D41/12, G08C17/04
[2006/25]
CPC:
A01D41/127 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/17]
Former [2006/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mähdrescher[2006/25]
English:Combine harvester[2006/25]
French:Moisonneuse-batteuse[2006/25]
Examination procedure21.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/06]
26.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2017Fee for grant paid
16.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.01.2007
Opposition(s)29.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
01.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
06.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201410   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2014
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.09.2005
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PT26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
TR26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
AT30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
GB30.09.2017
IE30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
LU30.09.2017
[2020/27]
Former [2020/15]HU30.09.2005
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
TR26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
AT30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
GB30.09.2017
IE30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
LU30.09.2017
Former [2019/46]HU30.09.2005
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
AT30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
GB30.09.2017
IE30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
LU30.09.2017
Former [2019/31]HU30.09.2005
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
AT30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
GB30.09.2017
IE30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
LU30.09.2017
Former [2019/10]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
AT30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
GB30.09.2017
IE30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
LU30.09.2017
Former [2018/35]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
CH30.09.2017
GB30.09.2017
IE30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
LU30.09.2017
Former [2018/34]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
CH30.09.2017
IE30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
LU30.09.2017
Former [2018/30]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
LU30.09.2017
Former [2018/25]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/09]DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/50]ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/49]ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL26.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0011991  (ALLMAN & CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - line 23 * * page 3, line 25 - line 29 * * page 4, line 20 - line 24 * * page 5, line 17 - line 23 * * page 6, line 3 - line 25 * * page 7, line 1 - line 20 * * page 8, line 14 - line 20 * * page 9, line 10 - line 18 ** figure -; claim - *;
 [XD]DE19618033  (SCHRATTENECKER FRANZ [DE]) [XD] 1-8,14-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0835603  (POETTINGER OHG ALOIS [AT]) [X] 1-7,14-20 * abstract * * column 2, line 11 - line 37 * * column 3, line 29 - line 57 * * column 4, line 5 - line 17 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [XP]DE10335112  (POETTINGER GMBH GEB [DE]) [XP] 1-7,14-20 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 6,7 * * page 3, paragraphs 12-14 * * figure -; claim - *
by applicantDE4133976
 DE19618033
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.