Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1787627

EP1787627 - Anti-microbial dental impression material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.05.2008
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Change - representativepublished on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US
Former [2007/21]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center, 2501 Hudson Road
St. Paul, Minnesota 55144-1000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Klettke, Thomas, Dr.
Graf-Berchtold-Str. 1a
86911 Diessen / DE
02 / Kappler, Oliver, Dr.
Oderdinger Strasse 17a
82362 Weilheim / DE
03 / Haeberlein, Ingo, Dr.
Oderdinger Strasse 23b
82362 Weilheim / DE
 [2007/21]
Representative(s)Fiesser, Gerold Michael , et al
Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/07]Fiesser, Gerold Michael , et al
Herzog Fiesser & Partner Isartorplatz 8
80331 München / DE
Former [2007/21]Fiesser, Gerold Michael , et al
KNH Patentanwälte, Kahlhöfer, Neumann, Herzog, Fiesser, Isartorplatz 8
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date05025182.617.11.2005
[2007/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1787627
Date:23.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61K6/10, // A61L2/00
[2007/21]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2008/05]
Former [2007/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Antimikrobielles Zahnabdruckmaterial[2007/21]
English:Anti-microbial dental impression material[2007/21]
French:Materiau d`empreinte dentaire antimicrobien[2007/21]
Examination procedure24.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/24]
28.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2008/24]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6559199  (PUSINERI CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-15 * examples 1-6 * [Y] 4;
 [YA]WO2005077321  (KETTENBACH GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * page 42, paragraph L - page 43, paragraph 2; examples 9b,9d,9e; table 4 * [A] 1-15;
 [AD]  - FLANAGAN D A ET AL, "Antimicrobial activities of dental impression materials.", DENTAL MATERIALS : OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE ACADEMY OF DENTAL MATERIALS. NOV 1998, (199811), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 0109-5641, pages 399 - 404, XP002391901 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * page 399, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 400, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0300-5712(99)00013-5
 [A]  - DEL PILAR RIOS MARIA ET AL, "Effects of chemical disinfectant solutions on the stability and accuracy of the dental impression complex", THE JOURNAL OF PROSTHETIC DENTISTRY, (199610), vol. 76, no. 4, ISSN 0022-3913, pages 356 - 362, XP002391902 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 357, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 358, column 2, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-3913(96)90538-7