Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1661978

EP1661978 - Detergent compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.01.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2011/09]
Former [2006/22]For all designated states
The Procter and Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lant, Neil Joseph
12 Warkworth Woods
Gosforth, Newcastle upon Tyne NE3 5RA / GB
02 / McRitchie, Allan Campbell
35 Monkseaton Drive
Whitley Bay, Tyne & Wear NE26 1SY / GB
03 / Clare, Jonathan Richard
77 Grosvenor Avenue
Jesmond, Newcastle upon Tyne NE2 2NQ / GB
04 / Souter, Philip Frank
The Nook The Green,Longhorsley
Morpeth;Newcastle upon Tyne NE65 8UP / GB
05 / Medina, Javier
130 Edge Hill
Ponteland Newcastle upon Tyne, NE20 9JL / GB
06 / Liu, Zaiyou
8040 Stone Barn Drive
West Chester Ohio 45069 / US
 [2011/09]
Former [2006/22]01 / Lant, Neil Joseph
12 Warkworth Woods
Gosforth, Newcastle upon Tyne NE3 5RA / GB
02 / McRitchie, Allan Campbell
35 Monkseaton Drive
Whitley Bay, Tyne & Waer NE26 1SY / GB
03 / Clare, Jonathan Richard
77 Grosvenor Avenue
Jesmond, Newcastle upon Tyne NE2 2NQ / GB
04 / Souter, Philip Frank
The Nook The Green,Longhorsley
Morpeth;Newcastle upon Tyne NE65 8UP / GB
05 / Medina, Javier
130 Edge Hill
Ponteland Newcastle upon Tyne, NE20 9JL / GB
06 / Liu, Zaiyou
8040 Stone Barn Drive
West Chester Ohio 45069 / US
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/40]Samuels, Lucy Alice , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2012/38]Clarke, Lionel Paul , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP
Broadgate House
7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2006/22]Peet, Jillian Wendy , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date05025877.128.11.2005
[2006/22]
Priority number, dateEP2004025738429.11.2004         Original published format: EP 04257384
US20050724758P07.10.2005         Original published format: US 724758 P
[2006/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1661978
Date:31.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1661978
Date:02.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/386, C11D3/50, C11D17/00
[2006/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/22]
TitleGerman:Waschmittelzusammensetzungen[2006/22]
English:Detergent compositions[2006/22]
French:Compositions de lavage[2006/22]
Examination procedure24.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/02]
20.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2011Fee for grant paid
12.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.12.2011  06.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP, et al
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 02  02.12.2011  06.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2019/04]
Former [2018/07]
Opponent(s)01  01.12.2011  06.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 02  02.12.2011  06.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/42]
Opponent(s)01  01.12.2011  06.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 02  02.12.2011  06.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/32]
Opponent(s)01  01.12.2011  06.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Bristow, Stephen Robert, et al
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB
 02  02.12.2011  06.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2012/43]
Opponent(s)01  01.12.2011  06.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Chisem, Janet, et al
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
 02  02.12.2011  06.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2012/03]
Opponent(s)01  01.12.2011    ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Elliott, Peter William
Patent Group Unilever Research Colworth Laboratory, Colworth House Shambrook
Bedford MK 44 1LQ / GB
 02  02.12.2011   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2012/02]
Opponent(s)01  01.12.2011    ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Elliott, Peter William
Patent Group Unilever Research Colworth Laboratory, Colworth House Shambrook
Bedford MK 44 1LQ / GB
11.01.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.07.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.03.2013Date of oral proceedings
06.05.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.05.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
14.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
28.08.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.08.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition28.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2191/17
08.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
19.10.2017Appeal received No.  T2191/17
05.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
05.07.2013Appeal received No.  T1598/13
18.09.2013Statement of grounds filed
08.01.2016Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
08.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
23.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
20.02.2008Request for further processing filed
20.02.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.04.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
06.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
TR02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
IE28.11.2011
LU28.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
CZ28.11.2012
HU29.11.2012
[2018/17]
Former [2013/44]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
TR02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
IE28.11.2011
LU28.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
CZ28.11.2012
HU29.11.2012
Former [2013/39]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
IE28.11.2011
LU28.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
CZ28.11.2012
HU29.11.2012
Former [2013/35]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
IE28.11.2011
LU28.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
CZ28.11.2012
Former [2012/10]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2011/50]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/47]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2011/41]AT02.03.2011
BE02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Former [2011/39]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Former [2011/37]CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Former [2011/36]LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Documents cited:Search[DY]WO0060063  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DY] 1-10 * page 7, line 12 - line 17; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US6245732  (GALLON LOIS SARA [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 10, line 47; examples III-VI * * column 14, line 44 - line 60 *;
 [DY]WO9942566  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DY] 1-10 * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 6 * * page 10, line 12 - page 12, line 12; claims 1-18 *;
 [A]US6790814  (MARIN EDGAR MANUEL [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7-10 * claims 1-13 *;
 [A]WO9428107  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-5,7-10 * examples III,V; claims 1-10 *;
 [DA]WO9711151  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [DA] 1-5,7-10 * page 22, line 32 - page 23, line 8; claims 1-17 *;
 [A]US6458754  (VELAZQUEZ JOSE MARIA [MX], et al) [A] 1-5,7-10 * example 7; claims 1-11 *
by applicantEP0430315
 WO0060063
 WO9942566
 WO02062973
 WO9704078
 WO9704079
 US5869438
 EP0258068
 EP0305216
 WO9711151
 US3971852
 US6458754
 US5656584
 US6172037
 US5955419
 US5691383
 WO9428017
 WO9841607
 WO9852527
 US3936537
 GB2311296
 US5360568
 US5360569
 US5370826
 WO9914245
    - LEO, COMPREHENSIVE MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, (1990), vol. 4, page 295