Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1635262

EP1635262 - Device diagnostics [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2015
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.03.2015  [2015/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Deutschland GmbH
Kemperplatz 1
10785 Berlin / DE
[2007/24]
Former [2006/11]For all designated states
Sony Deutschland GmbH
Hugo-Eckener-Strasse 20
50829 Köln / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Szucs, Paul
Stuttgart Technology Center Sony Deutschland GmbH
Hedelfinger Strasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Schwager, Andreas
Stuttgart Technology Center Sony Deutschland GmbH
Hedelfinger Strasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE
03 / Mayer, Matthias
Stuttgart Technology Center Sony Deutschland GmbH
Hedelfinger Strasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE
 [2006/11]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/11]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date05027368.931.01.2001
[2006/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1635262
Date:15.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1635262
Date:20.04.2011
[2011/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/273
[2006/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2011/52]
Former [2006/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gerätediagnose[2006/11]
English:Device diagnostics[2006/11]
French:Diagnostics de dispositif[2006/11]
Examination procedure25.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: divisional application deemed not to have been filed
28.06.2006Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
09.08.2007Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request rejected
19.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.10.2011Examination requested  [2011/48]
13.02.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/13]
Appeal following examination19.09.2007Appeal received No.  J0002/08
07.12.2007Statement of grounds filed
04.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
12.09.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01102231.6  / EP1229450
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010102231) is  01.06.2004
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
24.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
28.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
30.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0939321  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) [X] 1-33 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 1 * * column 3, lines 25-37; figure 1 * * column 3, paragraphs 12,13 * * column 4, paragraph 14 * * column 5, paragraph 21 * * column 7, lines 23-26 * * columns 7,8, paragraph 28 *;
 [X]  - IEEE, IEEE Standard for a High Performance Serial Bus, IEEE STD 1394 - 1995,NEW YORK, NY : IEEE,US, (1995), XP002171160 [X] 1-33 * pages 205-227 *
 [A]  - IEEE, ANSI/IEEE Std1212, 1994 Edition. Information technology- Microprocessor systems-Control and Status Registers (CSR) Architecture for microcomputer buses., NEW YORK USA, IEEE, (1994), XP002171161 [A] 1-33 * page 35, last paragraph *;; figures 18,19 * * pages 51-57 * * pages 79-100 *
 [A]  - IEEE, P1212 Draft Standard for a Control and Status Registers (CSR) Architecture for microprocessor buses, NEW YORK, USA, IEEE, (19991018), XP002171162 [A] 1-33 * pages 26-58 *
 [A]  - Romualdo Santamaria, "IP over IEEE-1394: Using the Internet Protocol over a high-performance serial bus", (20000401), pages 19 - 22, Dedicated Sytsems Magazine-2000 Q1, URL: http://www.omimo.be/Magazine/00q1/2000q1_p019.pdf, XP002624805 [A] 1-33 * the whole document *