Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1635262 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1635262



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 356
25.02.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
16.02.2015 Final instructions in case of withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
16.02.2015 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
13.02.2015 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
10.02.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.12.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.10.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
19.10.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
19.10.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
27.04.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.03.2011 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 2
23.03.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
24.12.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.12.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.12.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 7
28.09.2010 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
27.09.2010 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
27.09.2010 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 22
27.09.2010 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 1
04.01.2010 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
04.01.2010 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.11.2009 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.11.2009 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
30.10.2009 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 23
30.10.2009 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2009 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 2
30.10.2009 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 2
29.10.2009 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 15
09.10.2009 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.09.2009 amicus curiae Appeal 3
02.07.2009 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.06.2009 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.06.2009 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
22.06.2009 Composition of the board Appeal 1
12.06.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.06.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.06.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 44
08.06.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 44
12.09.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
01.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
01.08.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
01.08.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.07.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.07.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.05.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.05.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 27
20.05.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.01.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
07.01.2008 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
07.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 5
07.12.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
19.09.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
09.08.2007 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 7
15.05.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
19.04.2007 Annex Search / examination 2
19.04.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
11.04.2007 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
14.03.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 5
17.01.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
17.11.2006 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
29.09.2006 Matter currently under investigation Search / examination 1
28.06.2006 Request for a decision Search / examination 3
25.04.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no processing as European divisional application) Search / examination 1
01.02.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
14.12.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.12.2005 Claims Search / examination 7
14.12.2005 Description Search / examination 12
14.12.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.12.2005 Drawings Search / examination 9
14.12.2005 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
14.12.2005 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 6