blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1672803

EP1672803 - System for limiting receive audio [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2012
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.08.2014  [2014/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QNX Software Systems (Wavemakers), Inc.
302-134 Abott Street
Vancouver BC V6B 2K4 / CA
[2007/16]
Former [2006/25]For all designated states
Harman Becker Automotive Systems-Wavemakers, Inc.
302-134 Abbott Street
Vancouver, British Columbia, V6B 2K4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidt, Gerhard Uwe, Dr.
Jörg-Syrlin-Strasse 26
89081 Ulm / DE
02 / Haulick, Tim, Dr.
In den Schlobwiesen 14
89143 Blaubeuren / DE
 [2006/25]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/25]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05027407.514.12.2005
[2006/25]
Priority number, dateUS2004001207914.12.2004         Original published format: US 12079
[2006/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1672803
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1672803
Date:13.06.2007
[2007/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1672803
Date:06.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2007
ClassificationIPC:H04B1/38, H04M9/08
[2006/25]
CPC:
H04M9/082 (EP,US); H04B3/20 (KR); H04R3/04 (KR)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/08]
Former [2006/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:System zum Begrenzen von empfangenen Audiosignalen[2006/25]
English:System for limiting receive audio[2006/25]
French:Système pour la limitation des signaux audio de réception[2006/25]
Examination procedure14.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/44]
18.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.01.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
04.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2010Fee for grant paid
01.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201006   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2011
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT06.04.2011
[2014/32]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2004107724  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-32* page 9, line 32 - page 10, line 15 *
by applicantWO2004107724
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.