EP1630503 - Refrigerator having basket lift apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oh, Seung-Hwan Suri Hanyang Apt. 820-2102 1151-5 Sanbon-Dong Gunpo Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 02 /
Jeong, Kyung-Han 327-23, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Kim, Sang-Oh 201, 1022-27, Doksan 4-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05075005.8 | 03.01.2005 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | KR20040067605 | 26.08.2004 Original published format: KR 2004067605 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1630503 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1630503 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1630503 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F25D25/02, A47B88/00 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
A47B51/00 (EP,US);
F25D23/02 (KR);
F25D23/00 (KR);
F25D25/00 (KR);
F25D25/025 (EP,US);
A47B2210/17 (EP,US);
F25D25/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/09] | F25D25/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Title | German: | Kühlschrank ausgestattet mit einer Vorrichtung zum Heben eines Korbes | [2006/09] | English: | Refrigerator having basket lift apparatus | [2006/09] | French: | Réfrigérateur avec un dispositif de levage de panier | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 10.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.02.2009 | BE | 18.02.2009 | CY | 18.02.2009 | CZ | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | EE | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | IT | 18.02.2009 | LT | 18.02.2009 | NL | 18.02.2009 | PL | 18.02.2009 | RO | 18.02.2009 | SI | 18.02.2009 | SK | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | BG | 18.05.2009 | SE | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | ES | 29.05.2009 | IS | 18.06.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | HU | 19.08.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CY | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
HU | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CY | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001280830 ; | [A]JP2001343186 ; | [A]JP2001091151 ; | [A]US2855262 (SHARPE VERLOS G) [A] 1 * column 4, line 44 - line 72; figure - *; | [A]US3033636 (WURTZ CLIFFORD H, et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE2461853 (SCHWALM LIESELOTTE) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]DE29701227U (TIAW THUERINGER INST FUER AKAD [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2003173882 (KOONS BILL J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020402), vol. 2002, no. 02, & JP2001280830 A 20011010 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020804), vol. 2002, no. 04, & JP2001343186 A 20011214 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001091151 A 20010406 (MATSUSHITA REFRIG CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | JPH05296647 |