EP1579759 - A method of milking a dairy animal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/39] | A method of and a device for milking a dairy animal | ||
[2007/26] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2018 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lely Enterprises AG Bützenweg 20 6300 Zug / CH | [2018/08] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Lely Enterprises AG Bützenweg 20 6300 ZUG / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mostert, Gerard 11, Rozenstraat 3181 WV Rozenburg / NL | 02 /
Meijer, Eduard Lodewijk 95 Willemstraat 2514 HL Den Haag / NL | 03 /
Van Leeuwen, Alexander Adrianus 2 Mercuriusweg 2624 BC Delft / NL | 04 /
Klee, Tjark Onno 14 van der Fuyckstraat 3232 AP Brielle / NL | 05 /
Fransen, Renatus Ignatius Josephus 6 Prins Hendriklaan 3135 ZD Vlaardingen / NL | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [2018/08] |
Former [2005/39] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 110 3147 PA Maassluis / NL | Application number, filing date | 05075618.8 | 14.03.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | NL20041025819 | 26.03.2004 Original published format: NL 1025819 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579759 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1579759 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1579759 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01J7/02, A01J5/08 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
A01J5/08 (EP,US);
A01J7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2005/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Melken eines Milchtieres | [2007/26] | English: | A method of milking a dairy animal | [2007/26] | French: | Méthode pour traire un animal laitier | [2007/26] |
Former [2005/39] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Melken eines Milchtieres | ||
Former [2005/39] | A method of and a device for milking a dairy animal | ||
Former [2005/39] | Méthode et dispositif pour traire un animal laitier | Examination procedure | 06.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 30.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2008
28.01.2009
ADMISSIBLE DeLaval International AB Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE Opponent's representative Zacco GmbH, et al, et al Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2008
28.01.2009
ADMISSIBLE DeLaval International AB Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE Opponent's representative Zacco Denmark A/S, et al, et al Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2011/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2008
28.01.2009
ADMISSIBLE DeLaval International AB Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE Opponent's representative Amery, Marcus James, et al, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2010/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2008
28.01.2009
ADMISSIBLE DeLaval International AB Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE Opponent's representative Amery, Marcus James, et al, et al M James & Co 12 Deer Park Road London SW19 3FB / GB | ||
Former [2009/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2008
28.01.2009
ADMISSIBLE DeLaval International AB Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE Opponent's representative Amery, Marcus James, et al, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2008/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2008
DeLaval International AB Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE Opponent's representative Amery, Marcus James, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square GB-London WC1A 2RA / GB | 04.02.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.05.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.01.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.02.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.02.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.04.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.04.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.01.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 11.03.2011 | Appeal received No. T0595/11 | 20.05.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.05.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 27.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.10.2015 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.02.2008 | BE | 13.02.2008 | CY | 13.02.2008 | CZ | 13.02.2008 | EE | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | IT | 13.02.2008 | LT | 13.02.2008 | PL | 13.02.2008 | RO | 13.02.2008 | SI | 13.02.2008 | SK | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | IE | 14.03.2008 | LU | 14.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | BG | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | ES | 24.05.2008 | IS | 13.06.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | HU | 14.08.2008 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 14.03.2008 | ||
LU | 14.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 14.03.2008 | ||
LU | 14.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 14.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 14.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 14.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 14.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 14.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB629017 (GASCOIGNES READING LTD, et al) [A] 20,21 * page 2, line 61 - line 67 *; | [XY]US5881669 (VAN DEN BERG KAREL [NL], et al) [X] 20-22 * column 2 - column 8; figure 1 * [Y] 1-19; | [A]EP1234496 (MAASLAND NV [NL]) [A] 12 * column 8, line 9 - line 16 *; | [A]US6598560 (VAN DEN BERG KAREL [NL]) [A] 14 * figure 1 *; | [A]US6619227 (BERGER DENNIS [US], et al) [A] 22* column 1 - column 2 *; | [DXY]WO03077645 (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE], et al) [DX] 20-22 * page 9 - page 22; figures 1,3,6a * [Y] 1-19 | by applicant | WO03077645 | Opposition | GB447629 | US2226946 | US2228520 | US2616809 | GB911701 | US4222346 | EP0682862 | US5913281 | EP1219167 | WO2004004791 | EP1388281 |