Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1577159 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2821
12.01.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
12.01.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
12.01.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
12.01.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
06.01.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
22.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.12.2016 Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.12.2016 Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.12.2016 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
22.12.2016 French translation of claims Opposition 3
22.12.2016 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
22.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.10.2016 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
24.10.2016 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
24.10.2016 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
24.10.2016 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
24.10.2016 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
24.10.2016 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 14
18.10.2016 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
14.10.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
11.10.2016 Refund of fees Appeal 1
11.10.2016 Refund of fees Appeal 1
11.10.2016 Refund of fees Appeal 1
10.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
06.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.10.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
06.10.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
05.10.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 52
05.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.09.2016 General enquiry Appeal 2
06.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
06.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Appeal 4
06.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.07.2016 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 5
06.07.2016 Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal Appeal 2
06.07.2016 Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal Appeal 2
22.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
21.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.06.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
21.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
31.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
19.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
13.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.04.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 12
16.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.03.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
04.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.03.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.02.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.02.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.02.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
26.02.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
26.02.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
26.02.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
26.02.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
26.02.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
23.02.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.02.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 2
23.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.12.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
26.11.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.11.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.11.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.11.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.11.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
13.11.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 36
13.11.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 81
12.11.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 39
16.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 4
28.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
21.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.09.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.09.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.09.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
09.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
09.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
09.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
09.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
08.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.09.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
03.09.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
03.09.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
01.09.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
25.08.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.08.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.08.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.08.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
24.08.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
24.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
17.08.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
17.08.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
11.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
22.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
14.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 16
09.07.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.07.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 26
09.07.2015 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.07.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
09.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 11
12.06.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.05.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.04.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.04.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.04.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.04.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.04.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.04.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.04.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.04.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
09.04.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
09.04.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 68
09.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.04.2015 Non-scannable object Opposition 68
09.04.2015 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
09.04.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
02.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
31.10.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.10.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.10.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2014 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
05.09.2014 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
06.08.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.07.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
23.07.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.07.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.07.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.07.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.07.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
17.07.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.07.2014 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
16.07.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.07.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.07.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.07.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.06.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 6
30.06.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 6
18.06.2014 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 8
09.05.2014 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 4
09.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
06.05.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
02.05.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
25.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.04.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.04.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
31.03.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.03.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.03.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.03.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
22.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.03.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
20.03.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
20.03.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
20.03.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
20.03.2014 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 5
14.03.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.08.2013 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
06.08.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
11.03.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.05.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
17.04.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
16.04.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
12.04.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
05.04.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
02.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
02.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 22
02.04.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 59
02.04.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 59
29.03.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 9
09.01.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
29.11.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
18.11.2011 Claims Appeal 2
18.11.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
11.11.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
04.11.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
09.09.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
02.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.09.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.09.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
25.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.07.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
01.07.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
01.07.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
01.07.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
01.07.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
01.07.2011 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
01.07.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
01.07.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.07.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.07.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
01.07.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.06.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
19.05.2011 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 2
13.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
11.05.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2011 Claims Opposition 2
02.05.2011 Claims Opposition 2
02.05.2011 Claims Opposition 2
02.05.2011 Claims Opposition 2
02.05.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
29.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.04.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
26.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.04.2011 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2011 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2011 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2011 Claims Opposition 2
21.04.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
21.04.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
21.04.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 45
19.04.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.04.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.04.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.04.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.04.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.04.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.04.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
19.04.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 9
19.04.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.04.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
18.04.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
15.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
15.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
15.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
15.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
15.04.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.01.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.01.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.01.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 19
24.01.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.01.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.07.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
29.07.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 24
04.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.06.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.06.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.05.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.03.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.11.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.11.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.11.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.11.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 10
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
15.10.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
14.10.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.10.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
14.10.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
14.10.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
14.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
14.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
14.10.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
27.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2009 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
14.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2009 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 3
10.06.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.06.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
19.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.05.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 12
19.05.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 4
19.05.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
19.05.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 5
19.05.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 6
19.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
19.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 51
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 57
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
19.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
18.12.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.11.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.11.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
28.11.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
28.11.2008 Translation of priority document Search / examination 16
20.10.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.10.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
20.10.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.10.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
08.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
08.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
08.09.2008 Description Search / examination 4
08.09.2008 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
08.09.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
04.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
04.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
04.09.2008 Description Search / examination 4
04.09.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
20.05.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
25.04.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.04.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
10.04.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
07.04.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.01.2008 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
16.01.2008 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
10.01.2008 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 1
10.01.2008 Reply to communication to third party Search / examination 1
27.12.2007 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 14
27.12.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.12.2007 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
27.11.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
27.11.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.11.2007 Miscellaneous requests for changes concerning the applicant Search / examination 1
22.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
19.11.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
19.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
19.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
19.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
19.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
19.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 15
19.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
19.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
19.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
19.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
19.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
19.11.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
15.11.2007 Annex Search / examination 2
15.11.2007 Annex Search / examination 2
15.11.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
15.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 15
15.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
15.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
15.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
15.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.11.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
05.07.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
05.07.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.07.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
03.07.2007 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
03.11.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
03.11.2006 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 3
03.11.2006 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 3
03.11.2006 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 2
03.11.2006 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 2
03.11.2006 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
03.11.2006 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 2
03.11.2006 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 7
03.11.2006 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 1
03.11.2006 Observations by third parties Search / examination 25
03.11.2006 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 14
03.11.2006 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 10
03.11.2006 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 7
03.11.2006 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 3
03.11.2006 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 2
03.11.2006 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 1
03.11.2006 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 10
03.11.2006 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 14
03.11.2006 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 20
03.11.2006 Reply to communication to third party Search / examination 2
31.10.2006 Reply to communication to third party Search / examination 3
19.10.2006 Reply to communication to third party Search / examination 29
12.10.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
06.10.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
06.10.2006 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
26.09.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.09.2006 Observations by third parties Search / examination 72
07.02.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
07.02.2006 Description Search / examination 2
07.02.2006 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.02.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
26.09.2005 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.08.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
12.07.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.07.2005 European search report Search / examination 2
01.07.2005 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
19.05.2005 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.05.2005 Priority document Search / examination 23
13.04.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.04.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
13.04.2005 Description Search / examination 11
13.04.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.03.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.03.2005 Drawings Search / examination 7
21.03.2005 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
21.03.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
21.03.2005 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 16
18.03.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
18.03.2005 Drawings Search / examination 7
18.03.2005 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
18.03.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
18.03.2005 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 16