blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1593393 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1593393



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 5207
11.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.03.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
17.03.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 38
17.03.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
17.03.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.03.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.03.2017 Means of redress Search / examination 2
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.03.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.03.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
01.03.2017 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.03.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.10.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
27.10.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.10.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.10.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.09.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 26
30.09.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 4
28.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
21.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.09.2016 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 2
20.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.09.2016 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 2
21.03.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 7
09.03.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
09.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
07.03.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
04.03.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.03.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
04.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
04.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
04.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 73
04.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
04.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
04.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
04.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
04.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
02.03.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
26.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
26.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
25.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
24.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.02.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
24.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
11.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
11.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
09.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
08.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 16
04.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
04.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
04.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
04.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
29.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
26.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.01.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 22
26.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.01.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
08.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
07.01.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
07.01.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
07.01.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
07.01.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
04.01.2016 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
04.01.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
04.01.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 101
04.01.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
04.01.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.01.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.01.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.01.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
04.01.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.01.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
29.12.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.12.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.12.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.12.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.12.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.12.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
29.12.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 106
22.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.12.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
26.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.10.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 6
07.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
30.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.09.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 12
23.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
25.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
24.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
24.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
24.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
24.08.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.08.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
24.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
24.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
24.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
24.08.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 55
19.08.2015 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
06.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
31.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.07.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 9
31.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.07.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
22.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
17.07.2015 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
17.07.2015 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
15.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
09.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
09.06.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.06.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 19
09.06.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.06.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
04.05.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
13.04.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.04.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.04.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.04.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
07.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
07.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
07.04.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.04.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
07.04.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
07.04.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
07.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.04.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 59
30.03.2015 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
30.03.2015 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
30.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
30.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
30.03.2015 Refund of fees Appeal 1
24.03.2015 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
23.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
23.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
23.03.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
23.03.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
02.03.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
24.02.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
10.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.02.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.02.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
03.02.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 7
03.02.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
28.01.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
27.01.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
27.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
27.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
23.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
16.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
25.11.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 38
25.11.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 38
25.11.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.11.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
25.11.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 2
25.11.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.11.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 11
25.11.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
17.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
17.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
17.10.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
16.10.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 15
14.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.10.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.10.2014 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
10.10.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 31
10.10.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.10.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.10.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 26
10.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
07.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.09.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.08.2014 Matter concerning the application Opposition 1
21.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
21.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
21.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
21.08.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
20.08.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
20.08.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
20.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
18.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
14.08.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
14.08.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
14.08.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
14.08.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
14.08.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.08.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.08.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
14.08.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.08.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.08.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.08.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 13
14.08.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
14.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.08.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
14.08.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
14.08.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
14.08.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 16
14.08.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 16
14.08.2014 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.08.2014 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Opposition 3
14.08.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
14.08.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.08.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.08.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
14.08.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.08.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.08.2014 Request for change of address - applicant Opposition 1
14.08.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Opposition 2
14.08.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Opposition 1
12.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.07.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.07.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
12.03.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.12.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 29
10.12.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.12.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.12.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.12.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.12.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.12.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.12.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
03.12.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.11.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
11.11.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 4
11.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
11.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 72
05.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2013 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
30.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.07.2013 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
26.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2013 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 2
17.07.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Rejection of request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
26.06.2013 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.06.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
20.06.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
20.06.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
20.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.06.2013 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.06.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
17.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
17.06.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
17.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
17.06.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
21.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.03.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.03.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
15.02.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.02.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
18.01.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
04.01.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 20
04.01.2013 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Opposition 2
16.10.2012 Matter concerning the application Opposition 1
10.10.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.10.2012 Matter concerning the application Opposition 2
10.10.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.10.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.10.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.10.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.10.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.09.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.09.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.09.2012 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
05.09.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
05.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.09.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
05.09.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
05.09.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 76
05.09.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
03.09.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
03.09.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
03.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
03.09.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 41
03.09.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
03.09.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
03.09.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
30.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
30.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
30.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 40
30.08.2012 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
29.08.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
29.08.2012 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
29.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
29.08.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
29.08.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
29.08.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
29.08.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
29.08.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
29.08.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 2
29.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 6
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
29.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
29.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
29.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 35
29.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
29.08.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 25
29.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
29.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
29.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
29.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 59
29.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
29.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
29.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
29.08.2012 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
28.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 19
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 20
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 22
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 23
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
28.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
28.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
28.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 42
28.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
28.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
28.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
28.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 89
28.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 65
28.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 87
28.08.2012 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
28.08.2012 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
24.08.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
24.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 32
24.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
24.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
24.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 76
05.04.2012 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Opposition 1
05.04.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
16.03.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 2
16.03.2012 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Opposition 26
07.03.2012 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Opposition 26
23.12.2011 Request for change of name - applicant Opposition 5
04.11.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.09.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.09.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
27.09.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
27.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.09.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
26.09.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
26.09.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 3
26.09.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 84
19.09.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
19.09.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
19.09.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.09.2011 Description Search / examination 77
14.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.09.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.08.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.08.2011 Annex Search / examination 4
09.08.2011 Annex Search / examination 4
09.08.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 8
09.08.2011 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 19
09.08.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.08.2011 Annex Search / examination 4
02.08.2011 Annex Search / examination 4
02.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.08.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
02.08.2011 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 19
02.08.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.07.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
06.07.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.06.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
30.06.2011 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
24.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.06.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.06.2011 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
24.06.2011 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
24.06.2011 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 12
24.06.2011 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
24.06.2011 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
24.06.2011 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 10
24.06.2011 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 10
24.06.2011 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
24.06.2011 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 1
24.06.2011 Observations by third parties Search / examination 14
24.06.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 76
23.06.2011 Description Search / examination 76
23.06.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.06.2011 Description Search / examination 76
16.06.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.06.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.06.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
15.06.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
15.06.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
06.06.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
06.06.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
06.06.2011 Description Search / examination 14
06.06.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.05.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 25
08.04.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.04.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
08.04.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
15.02.2011 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.01.2011 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
07.01.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
07.01.2011 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
09.12.2009 Annex Search / examination 4
09.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
09.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
09.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
09.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
09.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 28
09.12.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
03.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
03.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
03.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
03.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
03.12.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
03.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
03.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
03.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
03.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
03.12.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
11.08.2009 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
11.08.2009 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.07.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
24.07.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.07.2009 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
16.07.2009 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
12.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
12.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
12.03.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
09.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
09.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
09.03.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
27.11.2008 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.11.2008 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
11.11.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
30.10.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
30.10.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.10.2008 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.10.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
23.10.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
23.10.2008 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
14.10.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
14.10.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
14.10.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.10.2008 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 2
10.06.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.06.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
03.06.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 14
17.12.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
12.11.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.11.2007 European search report Search / examination 3
28.07.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
27.07.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.07.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
13.07.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
11.07.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
28.09.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
26.04.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.04.2005 Annex Search / examination 2
26.04.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
26.04.2005 Description Search / examination 75
26.04.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.04.2005 Drawings Search / examination 8
26.04.2005 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
26.04.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.04.2005 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7
22.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 87