EP1621825 - Indoor unit for air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joo, Chang-Hwoi 12-109 Shinwol-dong Changwon-shi 641-060 Kyongsangbok-do / KR | 02 /
Kang, Seong-Min Joogong Apt. 209-701 Beoskkochmaeul Jaeun-dong Jinhae-shi 645-300 Kyongsangnam-do / KR | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05076424.0 | 06.12.2001 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | KR20010021436 | 20.04.2001 Original published format: KR 2001021436 | KR20010046403 | 31.07.2001 Original published format: KR 2001046403 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1621825 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1621825 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621825 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/14 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
F24F1/0011 (EP,US);
F24F13/20 (KR);
F24F1/0014 (EP,US);
F24F1/0057 (EP,US);
F24F1/0073 (KR);
F24F11/52 (KR);
F24F13/084 (KR);
F24F13/1426 (KR);
F24F13/15 (EP,US);
F24F13/28 (EP,KR,US);
F24F8/108 (EP,US);
F24F8/50 (EP,US);
F24F2013/1433 (KR);
F24F2013/1446 (KR);
F24F2013/205 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2006/05] | F24F13/00, F24F13/15, F24F1/00, F24F13/06, F24F13/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Innenraumeinheit für Klimaanlage | [2006/05] | English: | Indoor unit for air conditioner | [2006/05] | French: | Unité interne pour conditionneur d'air | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 28.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01274162.5 / EP1379816 | Divisional application(s) | EP06024503.2 / EP1775521 | EP06025007.3 / EP1775522 | EP06026258.1 / EP1775523 | EP06026269.8 / EP1770339 | EP06026270.6 / EP1777470 | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.02.2011 | BE | 16.02.2011 | CY | 16.02.2011 | DK | 16.02.2011 | FI | 16.02.2011 | IT | 16.02.2011 | NL | 16.02.2011 | SE | 16.02.2011 | TR | 16.02.2011 | GR | 17.05.2011 | ES | 27.05.2011 | PT | 16.06.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2012/23] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 16.02.2011 | |
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05187706 ; | [XY]JP2000234760 ; | [X]JPH09210401 ; | [X]JP2001065909 ; | [X]JPH0798129 ; | [XY]EP0984227 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0025] - [0051]; figures 2,6,7 * [Y] 23; | [XY]EP1079184 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0033] - [0052]; figures 1a,1b,2 * [Y] 23 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931115), vol. 017, no. 618, Database accession no. (M - 1510), & JP05187706 A 19930727 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-9,14,15 * abstract * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000234760 A 20000829 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [X] 1-5,7,23 * abstract * [Y] 23 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09210401 A 19970812 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP2001065909 A 20010316 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07098129 A 19950411 (MATSUSHITA SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * |