Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1595781

EP1595781 - Master cylinder lever for a hydraulic disc brake having on the fly dead-band adjustment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SRAM, LLC.
1333 North Kingsbury, 4th Floor
Chicago, IL 60642 / US
[2008/48]
Former [2005/46]For all designated states
SRAM CORPORATION
1333 North Kingsbury Street, 4th floor
Chicago, Illinois 60622 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lumpkin, Wayne R.
7060 W. Belmont Drive
Littleton Colorado 80123 / US
 [2005/46]
Representative(s)Thum, Bernhard
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2011/42]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
Vereenigde
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2008/34]Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F. , et al
Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2005/46]Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F. , et al
Vereenigde, Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date05076711.024.12.2002
[2005/46]
Priority number, dateUS20010344450P28.12.2001         Original published format: US 344450 P
US20020416130P04.10.2002         Original published format: US 416130 P
US20020416698P07.10.2002         Original published format: US 416698 P
US2002031644410.12.2002         Original published format: US 316444
US2002031659810.12.2002         Original published format: US 316598
US2002031645210.12.2002         Original published format: US 316452
[2005/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1595781
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1595781
Date:30.11.2005
[2005/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1595781
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2005
ClassificationInternational:B62L3/02
[2005/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/46]
TitleGerman:Geberzylinder für hydraulische Scheibenbremse mit während der Fahrt betätigbarer Einstellvorrichtung[2005/46]
English:Master cylinder lever for a hydraulic disc brake having on the fly dead-band adjustment[2005/46]
French:Maître cylindre pour frein à disque ayant une ajustabilité à la volée[2005/46]
Examination procedure26.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/46]
11.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2014Fee for grant paid
17.10.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.10.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02080490.2  / EP1325863
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020080490) is  18.02.2004
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.08.2015  01.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Shimano Inc.
3-77 Oimatsu-cho
Sakai-ku
Sakai City, Osaka 590-8577 / JP
Opponent's representative
Grosse, Felix Christopher
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14
80335 München / DE
 [2017/51]
Former [2015/40]
Opponent(s)01  26.08.2015   
Shimano Inc. (JP) / Paul Lange & Co OHG (DE)
3-77 Oimatsu-cho
Sakai-ku
Sakai City
Osaka 590-8577 / JP
Opponent's representative
Grosse, Felix Christopher
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14
80335 München / DE
05.10.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.12.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition01.02.2018Appeal received No.  T0323/18
29.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:06.01.2009
[2009/10]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES26.11.2014
IT26.11.2014
GB26.02.2015
FR02.01.2018
[2018/49]
Former [2016/07]ES26.11.2014
IT26.11.2014
GB26.02.2015
Former [2016/03]ES26.11.2014
IT26.11.2014
Former [2015/23]ES26.11.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US5813501  (TERRY SR MAURICE C [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0405945  (NISSIN KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [X]EP1160152  (FRENI BREMBO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *
by applicantUS6003639