Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1671536 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1671536



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 4041
19.06.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.06.2024 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
19.06.2024 French translation of claims Opposition 1
19.06.2024 German translation of the claims Opposition 1
19.06.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.06.2024 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
06.06.2024 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
03.06.2024 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
30.05.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.05.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.05.2024 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.05.2024 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
22.05.2024 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 17
22.05.2024 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
22.05.2024 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.05.2024 Means of redress Opposition 2
22.05.2024 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.03.2024 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.03.2024 Amended description with annotations Opposition 9
06.03.2024 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
06.03.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.03.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.03.2024 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.01.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Citation in opposition procedure - 059 Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Citation in opposition procedure - 071 Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Citation in opposition procedure - 072 Opposition 2
17.01.2024 Citation in opposition procedure - 073 Opposition 12
17.01.2024 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 3
17.01.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.01.2024 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
10.01.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.01.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
03.01.2024 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.11.2023 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
22.11.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.11.2023 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 2
21.07.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.07.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.07.2023 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.07.2023 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
18.07.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.07.2023 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.07.2023 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2023 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2023 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 19
18.07.2023 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 19
18.07.2023 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2022 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 7
29.04.2022 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 4
16.04.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.04.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.04.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.04.2021 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.01.2021 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 12
18.09.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
10.08.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
04.08.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.08.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.08.2020 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
06.02.2020 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Appeal 1
04.11.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
04.11.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
22.08.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
22.08.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
13.08.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.08.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
19.07.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
19.07.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
17.07.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
17.07.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
17.07.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.07.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.07.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.07.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.07.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
10.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.07.2019 General enquiry Appeal 1
10.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.05.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
15.03.2019 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.03.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 207
11.03.2019 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 1
11.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 069 Opposition 207
11.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 070 Opposition 12
11.03.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
11.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
11.03.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
13.02.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 5
25.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.01.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.01.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.01.2019 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
17.01.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
17.01.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
17.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.01.2019 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
12.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.01.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.01.2019 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 2
11.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
11.01.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.11.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.11.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.11.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.11.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.11.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.11.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
12.11.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
12.11.2018 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
12.11.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
12.11.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.11.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.11.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
12.11.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.10.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
19.10.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.10.2018 Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2018 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.07.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
27.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.06.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.06.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 1
22.06.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 068 Opposition 5
22.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.06.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
16.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 057 Opposition 1
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 058 Opposition 1
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 059 Opposition 1
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 060 Opposition 36
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 061 Opposition 130
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 062 Opposition 12
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 063 Opposition 1
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 063 Opposition 1
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 064 Opposition 2
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 064 Opposition 2
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 065 Opposition 3
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 066 Opposition 1
09.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 067 Opposition 9
09.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.05.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
09.05.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
11.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2018 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Opposition 1
11.01.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
11.01.2018 Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative Opposition 1
22.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.12.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.12.2017 Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative Opposition 1
19.12.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
19.12.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
19.12.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.12.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.12.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.09.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 056 Opposition 12
08.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
08.09.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
14.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.07.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 44
11.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.01.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
04.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 024 Opposition 18
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 025 Opposition 67
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 026 Opposition 92
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 027 Opposition 1
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 028 Opposition 2
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 029 Opposition 2
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 030 Opposition 2
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 031 Opposition 14
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 032 Opposition 13
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 033 Opposition 3
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 034 Opposition 3
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 035 Opposition 66
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 97
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 64
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 13
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 39
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 26
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 34
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 18
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 66
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 170
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 13
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 13
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 233
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 748
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 037 Opposition 2
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 038 Opposition 4
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 039 Opposition 4
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 040 Opposition 4
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 041 Opposition 6
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 042 Opposition 83
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 043 Opposition 6
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 044 Opposition 1
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 045 Opposition 2
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 046 Opposition 2
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 047 Opposition 1
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 048 Opposition 1
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 049 Opposition 1
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 050 Opposition 5
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 051 Opposition 1
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 052 Opposition 3
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 053 Opposition 1
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 054 Opposition 3
04.01.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 055 Opposition 59
04.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 4
04.01.2017 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 17
31.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.08.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 023 Opposition 2
25.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
25.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 7
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 7
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 2
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 2
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 2
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 2
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 009 Opposition 3
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 3
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 012 Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 014 Opposition 28
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 015 Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 016 Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 017 Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 018 Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 019 Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 020 Opposition 5
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 020 Opposition 11
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 021 Opposition 7
19.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 022 Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
19.07.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
21.10.2015 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
24.09.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.09.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
15.09.2015 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.09.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.09.2015 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
15.09.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 35
03.09.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
03.09.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
04.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.08.2015 Description Search / examination 29
04.08.2015 Drawings Search / examination 6
04.08.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
04.08.2015 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 1
20.07.2015 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.07.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.07.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.07.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
20.07.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 139
22.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.05.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.02.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.02.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
14.02.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 4
14.02.2014 Means of redress Search / examination 1
25.11.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 8
21.11.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.09.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.08.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
11.06.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.06.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
30.05.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
24.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
24.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
24.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 1
24.05.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
24.05.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
04.03.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.02.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.02.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
22.02.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.02.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 3
15.02.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
24.08.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 6
04.04.2012 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
14.02.2012 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
14.02.2012 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
14.02.2012 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 3
14.02.2012 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 3
12.04.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
12.04.2011 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
28.03.2011 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
23.03.2011 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.02.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.10.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
12.10.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
12.10.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
12.10.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 13
12.10.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
12.10.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.10.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.08.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
05.08.2009 Description Search / examination 3
05.08.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
30.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
30.07.2009 Description Search / examination 3
30.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
31.03.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
31.03.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.03.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.11.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
05.11.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
31.08.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.08.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.08.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.05.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.12.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.06.2006 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.05.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.04.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.04.2006 European search opinion Search / examination 2
13.04.2006 European search report Search / examination 3
05.04.2006 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
05.04.2006 Priority document Search / examination 67
05.04.2006 Priority document Search / examination 92
15.12.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.12.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
15.12.2005 Description Search / examination 107
15.12.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.12.2005 Drawings Search / examination 30
15.12.2005 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.12.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.12.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7