Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1800706

EP1800706 - Laryngeal mask [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.06.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unomedical A/S
Birkerød Kongevej 2
3460 Birkerød / DK
[2007/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Poulsen, Sylvia Ewa Krol
Allamanda D-38 Meru Valley Golf Club
30020 gen. Meru Valley / MY
 [2007/26]
Representative(s)Elmeros, Claus , et al
Høiberg P/S
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2007/26]Elmeros, Claus , et al
Hoiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date05078024.622.12.2005
[2007/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1800706
Date:27.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/04, B29C49/00
[2007/26]
Designated contracting states[2008/10]
Former [2007/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kehlkopfmaske[2007/26]
English:Laryngeal mask[2007/26]
French:Masque laryngien[2007/26]
Examination procedure28.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/31]
05.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2008/31]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US6050264  (GREENFIELD BRIAN GEORGE [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-11 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 16 * * figure - *;
 [X]WO2004016308  (NASIR MUHAMMED ASLAM [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,8-11 * page 14, line 28 - page 17, line 29 * * figures 5-9,10.1-10.6 * * page 21, lines 19-25 * * page 22, lines 22-32 *;
 [A]US2003192548  (CHANG TI-LI [TW]) [A] 6,7,9 * page 1, paragraph 21 - page 2, paragraph 28; figures 1-4 *;
 [DAX]WO2004089453  (AMBU AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * page 11, line 13 - page 12, line 22 * * figures 1b,1c * * page 17, line 11 - page 18, line 27 * * figure 8 * * page 18, line 29 - page 22, line 2 * * figures 9-11C * * page 2, lines 25-31 * * page 10, lines 10-20 * * figures 1a-1d; claim 1 * [X] 11;
 [A]GB2404863  (NASIR MUHAMMED ASLAM [GB]) [A] 4,5 * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 11 * * figures 10,10A-10C *;
 [DA]US6705318  (BRAIN ARCHIBALD I J [GB]) [DA] 4,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004112388  (RUSSELL JEREMY COLIN [GB]) [A] * page 1, paragraph 10 - page 2, paragraph 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [XA]EP0834331  (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [X] 11 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 58 * * figure - * [A] 12;
 [X]EP0845276  (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [X] 11,12 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 37 * * figure - *;
 [X]EP0857492  (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [X] 11,12 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 18 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5391248  (BRAIN ARCHIBALD I J [GB]) [A] 12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005005931  (DOANE MARK WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 12 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6712833  (LEE JEONG S [US], et al) [X] 12 * column 4, line 48 - column 8, line 6 * * figure - *;
 [A]US2003074017  (SHAH TILAK M [US]) [A] 12 * page 4, paragraph 54; figure 6 *
by applicantUS4509514
 US6705318
 EP1218396
 WO2004089453
 WO0061213
 WO2004064908