blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1580726

EP1580726 - Method and device for varying the vertical image refresh frequency [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.01.2011
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.02.2011  [2011/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Automotive GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/20]For all designated states
Continental Automotive GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stang, Udo
Asamstr. 29
93051, Regensburg / DE
 [2005/39]
Application number, filing date05100535.327.01.2005
[2005/39]
Priority number, dateDE2004101443624.03.2004         Original published format: DE102004014436
[2005/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1580726
Date:28.09.2005
Language:DE
[2005/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1580726
Date:17.03.2010
[2010/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2010
ClassificationIPC:G09G3/36, G09G3/20
[2005/39]
CPC:
G09G3/20 (EP); G09G2310/08 (EP); G09G2340/0435 (EP);
G09G2360/02 (EP); G09G3/3611 (EP)
Designated contracting states[2010/47]
Former [2005/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anordnung zur Variation einer Bildwiederholfrequenz[2005/39]
English:Method and device for varying the vertical image refresh frequency[2005/39]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour varier la fréquence de rafraîchissement d'image[2005/39]
Examination procedure02.08.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/06]
14.09.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201006   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5758135  (TUCKER DAVID M [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 4, line 57 - column 6, line 54; figures 5a, 6, 7 * [I] 4,9;
 [XI]EP0847194  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 6, line 22 - column 8, line 26; figures 8a, 8c, 9 *[I] 4,9
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.