Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1531427

EP1531427 - Method and apparatus for synthesizing patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2006
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gielis, Johan
Nottebohmstraat 8
2018 ANTWERPEN / BE
[N/P]
Former [2005/20]For all designated states
GIELIS, Johan
Nottebohmstraat 8
2018 ANTWERPEN / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Gielis, Johan
Nottebohmstraat 8
2018, Antwerp / BE
 [2005/20]
Representative(s)de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2005/20]de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date05100648.410.05.2000
[2005/20]
Priority number, dateUS19990133279P10.05.1999         Original published format: US 133279 P
[2005/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1531427
Date:18.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/20
[2005/20]
Designated contracting states[2006/06]
Former [2005/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schaffen von Mustern[2005/20]
English:Method and apparatus for synthesizing patterns[2005/20]
French:Procédé et dispositif de synthèse de motifs graphiques[2005/20]
Examination procedure19.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/32]
16.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2006/32]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00929732.6  / EP1177529
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.12.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005DE   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005FR   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.12.2005M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200506   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2005
31.05.200607   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5123734  (SPENCE ET AL) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [Y]  - KOLUNDZIJA B M ET AL, "SPIRAL SUPER-QUADRIC GENERATRIX AND BODIES OF TWO GENERATRICES IN AUTOMATED PARAMETERIZATION OF 3-D GEOMETRIES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199706), vol. 45, no. 5, PART 2, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 864 - 866, XP000951693 [Y] 1-9 * /*The whole document */ *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.575613
 [A]  - PEREZ-MUNUZURI V ET AL, "A geometrical-kinematical approach to spiral wave formation: super-spiral waves", PHYSICA D, NL, (19930430), vol. 64, no. 4, ISSN 0167-2789, pages 420 - 430, XP000952064 [A] 1-9 * /*The whole Document*/ *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-2789(93)90053-4