Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1568619

EP1568619 - Packaging for rigid plate like windscreen [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 22.09.2010  [2010/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DS Smith Kaysersberg
11 route Industrielle
68320 Kunheim / FR
[2007/29]
Former [2005/35]For all designated states
KAYSERSBERG PACKAGING
11, route Industrielle
68320 Kunheim / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Klinuski, Olivier
25a, rue de l'Alma
67390 Marckolsheim / FR
02 / Guardiola, Pierre-Henri
19, rue du Petit Colmar
68280 Sundhoffen / FR
 [2007/26]
Former [2005/35]01 / Klinuski, Olivier
25A rue de l'Alma
67390 Marckolsheim / FR
02 / Guardiola, Pierre-Henri
19 rue du Petit Colmar
68280 Sundhoffen / FR
Representative(s)David, Daniel , et al
Gevers France
41, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]David, Daniel , et al
Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2005/35]David, Daniel , et al
Cabinet Bloch & Associés 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date05101430.624.02.2005
[2005/35]
Priority number, dateFR2004000186825.02.2004         Original published format: FR 0401868
[2005/35]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1568619
Date:31.08.2005
Language:FR
[2005/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1568619
Date:17.10.2007
Language:FR
[2007/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:B65D85/48, B65B23/20
[2005/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/35]
TitleGerman:Verpackung für starre Platte wie Windschutzscheibe[2005/35]
English:Packaging for rigid plate like windscreen[2005/35]
French:Emballage pour feuille rigide comme un pare-brise[2005/35]
Examination procedure28.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/17]
23.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2007Fee for grant paid
29.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
EE17.10.2007
FI17.10.2007
IE17.10.2007
LT17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
GR18.01.2008
IS17.02.2008
LU24.02.2008
PT17.03.2008
HU18.04.2008
[2010/38]
Former [2010/33]CY17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
EE17.10.2007
FI17.10.2007
IE17.10.2007
LT17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
GR18.01.2008
IS17.02.2008
LU24.02.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2009/45]CY17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
EE17.10.2007
FI17.10.2007
IE17.10.2007
LT17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
GR18.01.2008
IS17.02.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2009/11]DK17.10.2007
EE17.10.2007
FI17.10.2007
IE17.10.2007
LT17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
GR18.01.2008
IS17.02.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2008/45]DK17.10.2007
IE17.10.2007
LT17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
IS17.02.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2008/39]DK17.10.2007
LT17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
IS17.02.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2008/35]DK17.10.2007
LT17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
IS17.02.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2008/26]LT17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
IS17.02.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2008/24]LT17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
IS17.02.2008
PT17.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2589604  (CUNNINGHAM GALE C, et al) [Y] 1-4,8,11 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 25; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]WO02068274  (INTERFACE INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,8,11 * page 3, line 18 - line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3389785  (LIDGARD EDWARD J) [A] 1-4,6,7,11 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 4; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2250971  (REMCOT LTD [GB]) [A] 10,12,13 * page 2, line 12 - line 33; figures 1-4 *