Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1580672

EP1580672 - Business application entity subscriptions synch operation management [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.10.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / El Husseini, Ahmad M.
c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
02 / Kureshy, Arif
c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
03 / Zhiyanov, Dmitry V.
c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
04 / Chopra, Gagan
c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
05 / Lorant, Misha H. St.
c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
 [2005/39]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/23]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2008/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2005/39]Zimmer, Franz-Josef
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05102220.021.03.2005
[2005/39]
Priority number, dateUS2004055525222.03.2004         Original published format: US 555252
US2004088455802.07.2004         Original published format: US 884558
[2005/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1580672
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1580672
Date:15.02.2006
[2006/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2005/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/39]
TitleGerman:Synchronisierungssteuerung von abonnierten Einheiten aus Geschäftsprogrammen[2005/39]
English:Business application entity subscriptions synch operation management[2005/39]
French:Contrôle de synchronisation d'unités abonnées de programmes d'activités économiques[2005/39]
Examination procedure22.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/31]
23.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
06.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
06.03.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination15.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1980/17
12.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.01.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
07.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003159136  (HUANG XIAO FEI ET AL) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0043]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0087] - [0099]; figures 9,10,10A *;
 [X]EP1387272  (SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [X] 1-30 * paragraphs [0019] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0108] , [0109] * * paragraphs [0250] - [0252]; figure 34 *;
 [A]WO03102823  (FUJITSU IT HOLDINGS, INC; TABELLION, NICHOLAS; GAGNON, ROBERT; PARE, M) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 10, lines 15-26; figure 1 *
 [A]  - AHEAD SOFTWARE GMBH, "NERO5 Burning Rom Brief Instructions", INTERNET PUBLICATION, (2001), URL: http://www.liteonit.com/ODD/Zip/nero_eng.pdf, (20051209), XP002356186 [A] 1,15 * pages 16-17 *
 [A]  - "SyncML Sync Protocol, version 1.1", SYNCML SYNC PROTOCOL, XX, XX, (20020215), pages 1 - 62, XP002332895 [A] 1,15 * section "2.8 Device Memory Management" *