Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1713201

EP1713201 - Gathering randomness in a smart card reader [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/42]Gathering Randomness in a Wireless Smart Card Reader
[2008/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Former [2006/42]For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Philip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Adams, Neil
550 Little Dover Cres.
Waterloo, Ontario N2K 4E4 / CA
02 / Brown, Michael S.
350 University Downs Crescent
Waterloo, Ontario N2K 4B1 / CA
03 / Little, Herb
504 Old Oak Place
Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2V8 / CA
04 / McCallum, Michael
23 Janet Court
Kitchener, Ontario N2A 4B8 / CA
05 / Brown, Michael K.
8 Fernwood Place
Kitchener, Ontario N2M 2Z2 / CA
 [2009/08]
Former [2006/42]01 / Adams, Neil
550 Little Dover Cres.
N2K 4E4, Waterloo / CA
02 / Brown, Michael S
350 University Downs Crescent
N2K 4B1, Waterloo / CA
03 / Little, Herb
504 Old Oak Place
N2T 2V8, Waterloo / CA
04 / McCallum, Michael
23 Janet Court
N2A 4B8, Kitchener / CA
05 / Brown, Michael K
8 Fernwood Place
N2M 2Z2, Kitchener / CA
Representative(s)Moore, Barry , et al
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2009/35]Moore, Barry , et al
Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Former [2008/44]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London
SW11 1BP / GB
Former [2006/42]Rickard, David John , et al
26 Mallinson Road
London SW11 1BP / GB
Application number, filing date05103029.415.04.2005
[2006/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1713201
Date:18.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1713201
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/22, G06K7/00
[2006/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/42]
Extension statesAL28.04.2005
BA28.04.2005
HR28.04.2005
LV28.04.2005
MK28.04.2005
YU28.04.2005
TitleGerman:Erfassung der Zufälligkeit in einem Chipkartenleser[2008/26]
English:Gathering randomness in a smart card reader[2009/08]
French:Obtention de caractéristiques aléatoires dans un lecteur de carte à puce[2008/26]
Former [2006/42]Erfassung der Zufälligkeit in einem drahtlosen Chipkartenleser
Former [2006/42]Gathering Randomness in a Wireless Smart Card Reader
Former [2006/42]Obtention de caractéristiques aléatoires dans un lecteur de carte à puce sans fils
Examination procedure28.04.2005Examination requested  [2006/42]
14.12.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.2008Fee for grant paid
11.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
IE15.04.2009
LU15.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
IE15.04.2009
LU15.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/21]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
IE15.04.2009
LU15.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/15]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
IE15.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/52]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
IE15.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/21]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
IE15.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/11]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/51]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Former [2009/45]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2004188519  (CASSONE JEAN [TH]) [Y] 1,2,6,7,10,11 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] * * paragraphs [0047] , [0056] * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0104] *;
 [Y]US2004109567  (YANG JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,6,7,10,11 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraphs [0064] , [0065] * * paragraphs [0067] , [0068] *;
 [A]US2002080965  (MARINET FABRICE [FR], et al) [A] 1,4,8,10,13,15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0046] *;
 [A]US6628786  (DOLE BRYN [US]) [A] 1,2,6,10,14 * column 4, lines 15-20 * * column 4, lines 36-57 * * column 5, lines 2-10 * * column 7, lines 14-33 *
by applicantUS2004188519
 US2004109567