Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1597965

EP1597965 - Broccoli type adapted for ease of harvest [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.10.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2019New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc.
800 N. Lindbergh Blvd.
St. Louis MO 63167 / US
[2013/40]
Former [2005/47]For all designated states
Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc.
2700 Camino Del Sol
Oxnard, CA 93030-7967 / US
Inventor(s)01 / van den Bosch, Franciscus G.J.M.
Achterdorp 1
4041 GJ Kesteren / NL
02 / Boon, Meinardus P.
Drieboomlaan 290
1624 BV Hoorn / NL
 [2005/47]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/24]von Menges, Albrecht
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2007/51]von Menges, Albrecht
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2007/41]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2005/47]van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date05103316.525.04.2005
[2005/47]
Priority number, dateUS2004085007719.05.2004         Original published format: US 850077
[2005/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1597965
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1597965
Date:12.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:A01H5/00
[2005/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/47]
TitleGerman:Brokkoliart angepaßt für Mühelosigkeit der Ernte[2006/05]
English:Broccoli type adapted for ease of harvest[2005/47]
French:Type de broccoli adapté pour la facilité de la moisson[2005/47]
Former [2005/47]Angepasste Brokkoliart zum mühelosen Ernten
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure01.05.2006Examination requested  [2006/24]
17.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
09.01.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2013Fee for grant paid
24.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10013140.8  / EP2286661
EP17190149.9  / EP3338542
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.04.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.03.2014  07.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
C. Then/R.Tippe et al
Frohschammerstrasse 14
80807 Munich / DE
 02  12.03.2014  12.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Syngenta Crop Protection AG
WRO-1008-Z1-26
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
SYNGENTA IP
CHBS-B4.8
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
 [N/P]
Former [2018/16]
Opponent(s)01  11.03.2014  07.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
C. Then/R.Tippe et al
Frohschammerstrasse 14
80807 Munich / DE
 02  12.03.2014  12.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Syngenta Crop Protection AG
WRO-1008-Z1-26
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Syngenta International AG
CHBS-B4.8
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2014/17]
Opponent(s)01  11.03.2014   
C. Then/R.Tippe et al
Frohschammerstrasse 14
80807 Munich / DE
 02  12.03.2014   
Syngenta Crop Protection AG
WRO-1008-Z1-26
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Syngenta International AG
WRO 1008-Z1-26
Schwarzwaldalle 215
4058 Basel / CH
03.08.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.12.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.08.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2018
19.09.2018Date of oral proceedings
30.10.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition06.12.2018Appeal received No.  T2840/18
11.03.2019Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIS12.10.2013
AT25.04.2016
CY25.04.2016
CZ25.04.2016
IE25.04.2016
LT25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
RO25.04.2016
SK25.04.2016
HU26.04.2016
SI26.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
EE30.04.2016
MC02.05.2016
GR04.11.2016
BG08.08.2017
[2019/11]
Former [2018/32]IS12.10.2013
AT25.04.2016
CY25.04.2016
CZ25.04.2016
IE25.04.2016
LT25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
RO25.04.2016
SK25.04.2016
HU26.04.2016
SI26.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
EE30.04.2016
MC02.05.2016
GR04.11.2016
Former [2017/38]IS12.10.2013
AT25.04.2016
CY25.04.2016
CZ25.04.2016
IE25.04.2016
LT25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
RO25.04.2016
SK25.04.2016
HU26.04.2016
SI26.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
EE30.04.2016
GR04.11.2016
Former [2017/11]IS12.10.2013
AT25.04.2016
CY25.04.2016
CZ25.04.2016
LT25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
RO25.04.2016
SK25.04.2016
HU26.04.2016
SI26.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
EE30.04.2016
GR04.11.2016
Former [2017/10]IS12.10.2013
CY25.04.2016
CZ25.04.2016
LT25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
RO25.04.2016
SK25.04.2016
HU26.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
EE30.04.2016
Former [2017/09]IS12.10.2013
CZ25.04.2016
LT25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
RO25.04.2016
HU26.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
EE30.04.2016
Former [2017/08]IS12.10.2013
LT25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
HU26.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
Former [2017/07]IS12.10.2013
LT25.04.2016
LU25.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
Former [2017/04]IS12.10.2013
LU25.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
Former [2016/37]IS12.10.2013
BE30.04.2016
Former [2014/14]IS12.10.2013
Former [2014/11]IT25.04.2013
IS12.10.2013
Former [2014/10]IS12.10.2013
Documents cited:Search[DX]  - BAGGETT JAMES R ET AL, "Inheritance of internode length and its relation to head exsertion and head size in broccoli", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 120, no. 2, ISSN 0003-1062, pages 292 - 296, XP008051285 [DX] 1-15 * the whole document * * table 1 *