Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1716972

EP1716972 - Pressure shoe layer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.07.2010
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
sia Abrasives Industries AG
Mühlewiesenstrasse 20
8501 Frauenfeld / CH
[2006/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Steiner, Armin
Hochwachtweg 5
8400 Winterthur / CH
 [2006/44]
Representative(s)Hetterscheidt, Stephan
Robert Bosch GmbH
(C/IPM1)
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/27]Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Former [2006/44]Hepp, Dieter , et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Application number, filing date05103518.628.04.2005
[2006/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1716972
Date:02.11.2006
Language:DE
[2006/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1716972
Date:11.08.2010
Language:DE
[2010/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:B24B21/08
[2006/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/44]
TitleGerman:Schleifschuhbelag[2006/44]
English:Pressure shoe layer[2006/44]
French:Insert pour patin de ponçage[2006/44]
Examination procedure17.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/22]
07.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2008Observations by third parties
19.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2010Date of oral proceedings
23.02.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2010Observations by third parties
14.06.2010Fee for grant paid
14.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10151894.2  / EP2189243
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.05.2011  17.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Steinemann Technology AG
Schoretshuebstrasse 24
9015 St. Gallen-Winkeln / CH
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt Weiß, Arat & Partner mbB, et al
Zeppelinstraße 4
78234 Engen / DE
 02  10.05.2011  20.03.2015  WITHDRAWN
Hülsemann GmbH
Im Waldteich 25
46147 Oberhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Demski, Siegfried, et al
Demski & Nobbe
Patentanwälte
Mülheimer Strasse 210
47057 Duisburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/34]
Opponent(s)01  09.05.2011  17.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Steinemann Technology AG
Schoretshuebstrasse 24
9015 St. Gallen-Winkeln / CH
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt Weiß, Arat & Partner mbB, et al
Zeppelinstraße 4
78234 Engen / DE
 02  10.05.2011  20.03.2015  WITHDRAWN
Hülsemann GmbH
Im Waldteich 25
46147 Oberhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Demski, Siegfried, et al
Demski & Nobbe
Patentanwälte
Tonhallenstraße 16
47051 Duisburg / DE
Former [2015/18]
Opponent(s)01  09.05.2011  17.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Steinemann Technology AG
Schoretshuebstrasse 24
9015 St. Gallen-Winkeln / CH
Opponent's representative
Arat, Dogan, et al
Dr. Weiss & Arat
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Zeppelinstraße 4
78234 Engen / DE
 02  10.05.2011  20.03.2015  WITHDRAWN
Hülsemann GmbH
Im Waldteich 25
46147 Oberhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Demski, Siegfried, et al
Demski & Nobbe
Patentanwälte
Tonhallenstraße 16
47051 Duisburg / DE
Former [2014/37]
Opponent(s)01  09.05.2011  17.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Steinemann Technology AG
Schoretshuebstrasse 24
9015 St. Gallen-Winkeln / CH
Opponent's representative
Arat, Dogan, et al
Dr. Weiss & Arat
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzleien
Zeppelinstraße 4
78234 Engen / DE
 02  10.05.2011  17.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Hülsemann GmbH
Im Waldteich 25
46147 Oberhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Demski, Siegfried, et al
Demski & Nobbe
Patentanwälte
Tonhallenstraße 16
47051 Duisburg / DE
Former [2013/12]
Opponent(s)01  09.05.2011  17.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Steinemann Technology AG
Schoretshuebstrasse 24
9015 St. Gallen-Winkeln / CH
Opponent's representative
Arat, Dogan, et al
Dr. Weiss & Arat
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzleien
Zeppelinstraße 4
78234 Engen / DE
 02  10.05.2011  17.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Hülsemann GmbH
Im Waldteich 25
46147 Oberhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Demski, Siegfried, et al
Ackmann, Menges & Demski
Patentanwälte
Postfach 20 03 11
47019 Duisburg / DE
Former [2013/03]
Opponent(s)01  09.05.2011  17.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Steinemann Technology AG
Schoretshuebstrasse 24
9015 St. Gallen-Winkeln / CH
Opponent's representative
Arat, Dogan, et al
Dr. Weiss & Arat
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzleien
Zeppelinstraße 4
78234 Engen / DE
 02  10.05.2011  17.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Hülsemann GmbH
Im Waldteich 25
46147 Oberhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Menges, Rolf, et al
Schumacher & Willsau
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Nymphenburger Straße 42
80335 München / DE
Former [2011/24]
Opponent(s)01  09.05.2011   
Steinemann Technology AG
Schoretshuebstrasse 24
9015 St. Gallen-Winkeln / CH
Opponent's representative
Arat, Dogan, et al
Dr. Weiss & Arat Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzleien Zeppelinstraße 4
78234 Engen / DE
 02  10.05.2011   
Hülsemann GmbH
Im Waldteich 25
46147 Oberhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Demski, Siegfried, et al
Ackmann, Menges & Demski Patentanwälte Postfach 20 03 11
47019 Duisburg / DE
22.06.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.10.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.12.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2013
13.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
01.02.2013Date of oral proceedings
18.02.2013Reply to a communication from the opposition division
25.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
12.05.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.05.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition09.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1417/15
14.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
03.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
03.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
HU11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
IS11.12.2010
MC30.04.2011
AT28.04.2016
GB28.04.2016
LU28.04.2016
PL28.04.2016
ES29.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
PT28.10.2016
[2018/28]
Former [2017/44]CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
HU11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
IS11.12.2010
MC30.04.2011
AT28.04.2016
GB28.04.2016
LU28.04.2016
PL28.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
PT28.10.2016
Former [2017/13]CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
HU11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
IS11.12.2010
MC30.04.2011
AT28.04.2016
GB28.04.2016
LU28.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
PT28.10.2016
Former [2017/08]CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
HU11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
IS11.12.2010
MC30.04.2011
GB28.04.2016
LU28.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
Former [2017/04]CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
HU11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
IS11.12.2010
MC30.04.2011
LU28.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
Former [2016/37]CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
HU11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
IS11.12.2010
MC30.04.2011
BE30.04.2016
Former [2013/45]CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
HU11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
IS11.12.2010
MC30.04.2011
Former [2011/29]CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
RO11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
IS11.12.2010
Former [2011/23]CY11.08.2010
CZ11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
EE11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
SK11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
IS11.12.2010
Former [2011/19]CY11.08.2010
DK11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
IE11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
IS11.12.2010
Former [2011/15]CY11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
SE11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
GR12.11.2010
IS11.12.2010
Former [2011/13]CY11.08.2010
FI11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
IS11.12.2010
Former [2011/11]FI11.08.2010
LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
SI11.08.2010
BG11.11.2010
Former [2011/08]LT11.08.2010
NL11.08.2010
Documents cited:Search[XY]AT617U  (WERNER NEUKAMP KUNSTSTOFFVERAR [AT]) [X] 1-3 * page 4; figure 3 * [Y] 4-12;
 [X]DD298613  (WTZ HOLZVERARBEITENDE IND [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE9103014U  (JOHANNSEN, HANS-PETER, DIPL.-ING., 3559 BATTENBERG, DE) [X] 1-3,13 * page 6 *;
 [DXY]DE20315291U  (HUELSEMANN THOMAS [DE]) [DX] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 4;
 [Y]EP0227859  (CARBORUNDUM SCHLEIFMITTEL [DE]) [Y] 4-12 * column 3, lines 9-25 *;
 [X]DE8814128U  (REINHOLD HESS GMBH & CO KG MASCHINENBAU, 7460 BALINGEN, DE) [X] 5,6,22,23 * page 8, lines 6-13; figure 5 *;
 [X]EP1048402  (TASIKAS JAMES [CA]) [X] 5,6,22,23 * paragraphs [0047] , [0048]; figure 4 *;
 [X]DE1944194  (C F SCHROEDER SCHMIRGELWERKE K) [X] 5,6,22,23 * the whole document *
otherDE3521840
    - "Uber den Holzschliff - Eine broschure fur den handwerker", (1991), pages 1,2,5 - 24, XP003021105