Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1615187

EP1615187 - Personal safety device detecting its removal from a wearer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.09.2011
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2019New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vivago Oy
Itsehallintokuja 4
02600 Espoo / FI
[2015/32]
Former [2006/02]For all designated states
IST International Security Technology OY
Melkonkatu 16 A
00210 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Särelä, Antti
Muolaantie 26 B
02140, Espoo / FI
02 / Myllymäki, Marko
Niittykulmantie 5 as 10
00440, Helsinki / FI
 [2006/02]
Representative(s)LEITZINGER OY
Tammasaarenkatu 1
00180 Helsinki / FI
[2006/02]
Application number, filing date05105609.123.06.2005
[2006/02]
Priority number, dateFI2004000526606.07.2004         Original published format: FI 20045266
[2006/02]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1615187
Date:11.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2005
ClassificationInternational:G08B25/01, G06F19/00, A61B5/00
[2006/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/02]
TitleGerman:Persönliches Sicherheitsgerät welches das Entfernen vom Träger detektiert[2006/02]
English:Personal safety device detecting its removal from a wearer[2006/02]
French:Dispositif de securité personnel sur un porteur détectant son enlèvement[2006/02]
Examination procedure11.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/34]
19.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
04.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
04.05.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination25.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1780/15
26.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
14.11.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2019/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.06.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]US6072392  (HENDERSON HERBERT JEFFERSON [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,8 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 47 * * column 3, lines 1-5 * * column 7, lines 27-50 * * figures 1,7,15-17,21-23 *;
 [X]US2003069714  (WIGLEY FREDRICK M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] - [0009] - [0017] , [0023] , [0026] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US5982285  (BUECHE KENNETH M [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, lines 16-18,45-65 * * column 3, lines 5-14,50-52 * * column 4, lines 1-12 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US4736196  (MCMAHON WALTER W [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2002013717  (ANDO MASAHIRO [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]JPH05327595
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940311), vol. 018, no. 148, Database accession no. (E - 1522), & JP05327595 A 19931210 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantUS6072392
    - PORTEUS J.; BROWNSELL S., "Exploring technologies for independent living for older people", ANCHOR TRUST, (2000), page 60