Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1628198

EP1628198 - User interface for displaying a gallery of formatting options applicable to a selected object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
[2016/07]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
Former [2006/08]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Butcher, Aaron M.
c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way
98052, Redmond / US
02 / Himberger, Andrew M.
c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way
98052, Redmond / US
03 / Harris, Jensen M.
c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way
98052, Redmond / US
04 / Satterfield, Jesse Clay
c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way
98052, Redmond / US
05 / Gauthier, Tracey M.
c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way
98052, Redmond / US
 [2006/08]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/23]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2008/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2006/08]Zimmer, Franz-Josef
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05107157.903.08.2005
[2006/08]
Priority number, dateUS2004060181516.08.2004         Original published format: US 601815
US2004095594230.09.2004         Original published format: US 955942
[2006/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1628198
Date:22.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1628198
Date:04.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/048
[2012/14]
Former International [2006/08]G06F3/033
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/08]
TitleGerman:Benutzerschnittstelle zur Darstellung einer Reihe von Formatierungsmöglichkeiten für ein bestimmtes Objekt[2006/08]
English:User interface for displaying a gallery of formatting options applicable to a selected object[2006/08]
French:Interface utilisateur permettant d'afficher une galerie d'options de formatage pour un object selectionné[2006/08]
Examination procedure04.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2012Examination requested  [2012/46]
20.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.03.2018
27.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
21.03.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Appeal following examination13.03.2018Appeal received No.  T2223/18
18.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002140740  (CHEN CHIEN-AN [TW]) [X] 1-45 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0036]; figures 4-12 *;
 [X]US5844558  (KUMAR PRAMATHESH [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * column 3, line 38 - column 15, line 21; figures 2-10 *;
 [A]  - "INDEX CARD METAPHOR FOR MULTIPLE PROPERTY SHEETS ASSOCIATED WITH A GIVEN OBJECT", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP. (THORNWOOD), US, (19900801), vol. 33, no. 3A, ISSN 0018-8689, page 31/32, XP000123842 [A] 12-16,28-45 * the whole document *
 [A]  - "MENU SELECTION METHOD FOR RELATED ATTRIBUTES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP. (THORNWOOD), US, (19901101), vol. 33, no. 6B, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 423 - 425, XP000108939 [A] 1-45 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2002140740
 US5844558
    - "Index Card Metaphor for Multiple Property Sheets Associated with a Given Object", IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP., (19900801), vol. 33, page 31,32
    - "Menu Selection Method for Related Attributes", IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP., (19901101), vol. 33, pages 423 - 425