Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1650655

EP1650655 - Method and system for managing memory [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/17]Method and System for Managing Memory
[2006/18]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.04.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
[N/P]
Former [2016/25]For all designated states
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
Former [2006/17]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
20555 S.H. 249
Houston, TX 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Muppirala, Kishore Kumar
Hewlett-Packard (India) Pte Ltd 29 Cunningham Road
Bangalore, 560052, Karnataka / IN
 [2006/18]
Former [2006/17]01 / MUPPIRALA, Kishore Kumar
Hewlett-Packard (India) Pte Ltd 29 Cunningham Road
560052, Karnataka / IN
Representative(s)Iqbal, Md Mash-Hud
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/43]Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell
EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
Former [2009/26]Lloyd, Richard Graham
Hewlett Packard CCF IP Section - Legal Department 5, Avenue Raymond Chanas-Eybens
38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2006/17]Lloyd, Richard Graham
Hewlett Packard France IP Section - Legal Department 5 Ave Raymond Chanas-Eybens
38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date05108751.822.09.2005
[2006/17]
Priority number, dateGB2004002194702.10.2004         Original published format: GB 0421947
[2006/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1650655
Date:26.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1650655
Date:26.09.2007
[2007/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/50
[2006/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/17]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Speicherverwaltung[2006/17]
English:Method and system for managing memory[2006/18]
French:Procédé et système pour gérer de la mémoire[2006/17]
Former [2006/17]Method and System for Managing Memory
Examination procedure19.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/14]
24.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination12.01.2015Appeal received No.  T0715/15
13.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
24.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
23.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
22.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
19.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003212873  (LEE VAN HOA [US], et al) [X] 1-51 * claims 1-7 * * column 35 - column 45 * * figure 6 *;
 [X]US2002016891  (NOEL KAREN L [US], et al) [X] 1-51 * figures 9,10 * * claims 1-10 * * page 19 - page 22 *
by applicantUS2003212873
 US2003217153