Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1650655 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1650655



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 328
15.11.2019 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal Appeal 1
11.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.11.2019 General enquiry Appeal 1
11.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.08.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
23.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.08.2019 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
23.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.08.2019 General authorisation Appeal 1
20.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.08.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
19.08.2019 Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation Appeal 3
12.08.2019 General authorisation Appeal 1
12.08.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 13
05.08.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
12.07.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
31.05.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Appeal 1
25.05.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 2
23.05.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
04.05.2016 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 53
10.06.2015 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
13.04.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
31.03.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
13.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
13.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
13.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
13.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
13.03.2015 Amended description with annotations Appeal 1
13.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.03.2015 Description Appeal 1
13.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.03.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
12.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.11.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.11.2014 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
03.11.2014 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
03.11.2014 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
03.11.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
03.11.2014 Means of redress Search / examination 2
19.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
11.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.04.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
11.04.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 9
11.04.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
11.04.2012 Description Search / examination 8
11.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.04.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.03.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.03.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.10.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.10.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.09.2011 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
22.09.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.08.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
23.08.2011 General authorisation Search / examination 2
13.12.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.05.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
03.11.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.11.2008 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
03.11.2008 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 14
03.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
03.11.2008 Description Search / examination 11
03.11.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.11.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.08.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.08.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.08.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.08.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.04.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.02.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.02.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.02.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.10.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.08.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.08.2007 European search opinion Search / examination 5
24.08.2007 European search report Search / examination 2
15.03.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
29.09.2005 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
29.09.2005 Priority document Search / examination 46
22.09.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.09.2005 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
22.09.2005 Claims Search / examination 7
22.09.2005 Description Search / examination 14
22.09.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.09.2005 Drawings Search / examination 9
22.09.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 3