Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1650655


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.09.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.08.2019 Change - representative
10.08.2019 Change - representative
25.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.05.2016 Change - applicant published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
02.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2015 Change: Appeal number
17.03.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
13.01.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
13.01.2015 New entry: Appeal number
04.11.2014 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
27.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.09.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.09.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.04.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.03.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.10.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.09.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.09.2011 Change - representative published on  26.10.2011  [2011/43]
30.09.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.10.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2009 Change - representative published on  24.06.2009  [2009/26]
19.01.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.10.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.08.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.05.2008 Definitive list of designations published on  04.06.2008  [2008/23]
18.04.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.04.2008 First examination report
29.02.2008 Request for examination filed published on  02.04.2008  [2008/14]
06.10.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.08.2007 Publication of search report published on  26.09.2007  [2007/39]
17.03.2006 Change - inventor published on  03.05.2006  [2006/18]
17.03.2006 Change - English title published on  03.05.2006  [2006/18]
10.03.2006 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2006  [2006/17]