Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1621169

EP1621169 - Apertured polymeric film webs and absorbent articles using such webs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 11.10.2017  [2017/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2014/30]
Former [2006/05]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Yann-Per
2347 North Sarazen Drive
Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US
02 / Fereshtehkhou, Saeed
7336 Sanderson Place
Cincinnati, Ohio 45243 / US
03 / Stone, Keith Joseph
1923 Augusta Boulevard
Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US
 [2014/30]
Former [2006/32]01 / Lee, Yann-Per
2347 North Sarazen Drive
Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US
02 / Fereshtehkhou, Saeed
7336 Sanderson Place
Cincinnati, Ohio 45243 / US
03 / Stone, Keith Joseph
1923 Augusta Boulevard
Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US
Former [2006/05]01 / Lee, Yann-Per
6386 Kings Arms Way
Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US
02 / Fereshtehkhou, Saeed
7336 Sanderson Place
Cincinnati, Ohio 45243 / US
03 / Stone, Keith Joseph
1923 Augusta Boulevard
Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US
Representative(s)Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/37]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Former [2014/32]Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Former [2014/30]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Former [2010/32]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2008/36]L'Huillier, Florent Charles , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2006/49]L'Huillier, Florent Charles , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
65823 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE
Former [2006/05]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH, Patent Department, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
60823 Schwalbach / DE
Application number, filing date05110224.206.04.2001
[2006/05]
Priority number, dateUS2000054488607.04.2000         Original published format: US 544886
[2006/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1621169
Date:01.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1621169
Date:03.01.2007
[2007/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1621169
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1621169
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/512, A61F13/511, A61F13/15, B26F1/10, B26F1/24, B26F1/26, B32B3/10, A61F13/513
[2013/46]
Former International [2006/05]A61F13/15
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2017/37]
Former [2007/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Former [2007/36]
Former [2006/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mit Öffnungen versehene Polymerfilmbahn und absorbierende Artikel, die diese enthalten[2006/05]
English:Apertured polymeric film webs and absorbent articles using such webs[2006/05]
French:Films polymères ajourés, ainsi que les articles absorbants comprenant de tels films[2006/05]
Examination procedure09.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/41]
26.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
10.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
03.06.2014Fee for grant paid
03.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01930453.4  / EP1267780
Divisional application(s)EP14178002.3  / EP2807995
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010930453) is  11.04.2003
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.04.2015  23.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schneider, Dr.Peter c/o Fiedler, Ostermann & Schneider
Obere Karspüle 41
37073 Göttingen / DE
 02  22.04.2015   
NEOS ITALIA S.r.l.
Via Aterno 36
Sambuceto
66020 S. Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT
Opponent's representative
Raimondi, Margherita, et al
Dott. Ing. Prof. Alfredo Raimondi S.r.l.
Piazzale Cadorna, 15
20123 Milano / IT
 [2015/22]
02.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.12.2016Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.01.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.05.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
04.08.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
03.06.2014Request for further processing filed
03.06.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.06.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.08.2007AT   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007BE   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007CH   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007CY   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007DE   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007DK   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007ES   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007FI   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007FR   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007GB   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007GR   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007IE   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007IT   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007LU   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007MC   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007NL   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007PT   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007SE   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
22.08.2007TR   M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.08.2007M01   Fee paid on   22.08.2007
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.11.200503   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2006
01.11.200504   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2006
01.11.200505   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2006
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
IE06.04.2015
IT06.04.2015
LU06.04.2015
ES07.04.2015
SE07.04.2015
BE30.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
NL01.05.2015
[2017/41]
Former [2016/35]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
IE06.04.2015
IT06.04.2015
LU06.04.2015
ES07.04.2015
SE07.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
NL01.05.2015
Former [2016/20]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
IE06.04.2015
IT06.04.2015
LU06.04.2015
SE07.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
NL01.05.2015
Former [2016/14]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
IT06.04.2015
LU06.04.2015
SE07.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
NL01.05.2015
Former [2016/11]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
IT06.04.2015
LU06.04.2015
SE07.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/08]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
IT06.04.2015
LU06.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/06]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
LU06.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/01]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
LU06.04.2015
Former [2015/52]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
LU06.04.2015
Former [2015/22]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI23.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US4327730  (SORENSEN EUGENE R) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 9 - line 20 * * column 4, line 1 - line 3 * * column 5, line 35 - line 40 * * column 6, line 11 - line 15 *;
 [X]US5997986  (TURI MORDECHAI [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 1-28 * * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-11 *;
 [X]US4637819  (OUELLETTE WILLIAM R [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * example 1 * * figures 1-7 *;
 [X]WO9930658  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 7, lines 1-30 * * page 13, line 1 - line 7 * * page 16, line 18 - page 19, line 27 * * figures 1-16 *;
 [DX]US6025049  (OUELLETTE WILLIAM R [US], et al) [DX] 1-10 * figure 2 * * figure 2 *;
 [DX]US4629643  (CURRO JOHN J [US], et al) [DX] 1-10 * figure 7 * * column 11, line 28 - column 12, line 41 *;
 [DX]US4609518  (CURRO JOHN J [US], et al) [DX] 1-10 * figures 1-19 * * examples 1-3 *
OppositionUS4327730
 US4637819
 US4629643
 US4614679
 US5990377
 US5188625
 JPH11239587
 WO9740793
 US4798604
 US3566726
 US4509908
 US5733628
 WO9711662
 US4609518
 US4820294
 US5704101
 US5709829
 WO0000231
 US5262107
 US4463045
 WO9600548
 US4342314
 US4859519
 US5518801