Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1681652

EP1681652 - Method nad system for synchronizing multiple user revisions to a shared object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.02.2011
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2006/29]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond WA 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Clarke, Simon P.
c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way
98052, Redmond / US
02 / Rasmussen, David
c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way
98052, Redmond / US
03 / Kofman, Igor
c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way
98052, Redmond / US
 [2006/29]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/29]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05112294.316.12.2005
[2006/29]
Priority number, dateUS2005003569814.01.2005         Original published format: US 35698
[2006/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1681652
Date:19.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1681652
Date:04.07.2007
[2007/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06Q10/00
[2007/27]
Former International [2006/29]G06Q10/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/29]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Synchronisierung mehrfacher Benutzerüberprüfungen eines gemeinsamen Objekts[2006/29]
English:Method nad system for synchronizing multiple user revisions to a shared object[2006/29]
French:Procédé et système de synchronisation de plusieurs révisions dýutilisateur à un objet partagé[2006/29]
Examination procedure14.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/04]
24.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.05.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination28.07.2016Appeal received No.  T2453/16
11.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
31.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
07.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
06.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0907125  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6341291  (BENTLEY KEITH A [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 20 * * column 8, line 57 - column 10, line 22 * * column 12, line 45 - column 13, line 38 *;
 [X]US6240414  (BEIZER MORDECHAI M [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2004064481  (DEXTERRA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5-9,13-20 * page 4, line 18 - page 4, line 29 * * page 9, line 3 - page 10, line 10 * * page 17, line 11 - page 20, line 11 * * page 24, line 14 - page 36, line 14 *;
 [Y]US5890177  (MOODY PAUL B [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,10-12 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - VOGEL J ET AL, "Consistency control for synchronous and asynchronous collaboration based on shared objects and activities", COMPUTER SUPPORTER COOPERATIVE WORK, DORDRECHT, NL, (200412), vol. 13, no. 5-6, ISSN 0925-9724, pages 573 - 602, XP002374473 [X] 1,5-9,13-20 [Y] 2-4,10-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10606-004-5064-6