blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1559347

EP1559347 - Height adjustment mechanism for a chair [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.06.2009
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Knoll, Inc.
1235 Water Street East Greenville
Pennsylvania 18041 / US
[2008/31]
Former [2005/31]For all designated states
Knoll, Inc.
1235 Water Street
East Greenville, Pennsylvania 18041 / US
Inventor(s)01 / van Hekken, Hendrik R.
3760 Manchester Road
Allentown, Pennsylvania 18104 / US
 [2005/31]
Representative(s)Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/31]Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB
Application number, filing date05250311.721.01.2005
[2005/31]
Priority number, dateUS2004076906130.01.2004         Original published format: US 769061
[2005/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1559347
Date:03.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1559347
Date:29.03.2006
[2006/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1559347
Date:30.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2006
ClassificationIPC:A47C1/03
[2005/31]
CPC:
A47C1/0305 (EP,US); A47C1/03 (US); Y10T403/32459 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/31]
TitleGerman:Mechanismus zum Einstellen der Höhe für einen Stuhl[2005/31]
English:Height adjustment mechanism for a chair[2005/31]
French:Mécanisme de réglage en hauteur pour une chaise[2005/31]
Examination procedure06.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/29]
30.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2008Fee for grant paid
13.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
24.04.2008Request for further processing filed
24.04.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.06.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.07.2008
CY30.07.2008
CZ30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
EE30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
PL30.07.2008
RO30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
SK30.07.2008
TR30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
SE30.10.2008
GR31.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
IE21.01.2009
LU21.01.2009
HU31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/32]AT30.07.2008
CZ30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
EE30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
PL30.07.2008
RO30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
SK30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
SE30.10.2008
GR31.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
IE21.01.2009
LU21.01.2009
HU31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2011/21]AT30.07.2008
CZ30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
EE30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
PL30.07.2008
RO30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
SK30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
SE30.10.2008
GR31.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
IE21.01.2009
LU21.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2010/52]AT30.07.2008
CZ30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
EE30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
PL30.07.2008
RO30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
SK30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
SE30.10.2008
GR31.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
IE21.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2010/24]AT30.07.2008
CZ30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
EE30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
PL30.07.2008
RO30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
SK30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
SE30.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
IE21.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2010/12]AT30.07.2008
CZ30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
EE30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
RO30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
SK30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
SE30.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
IE21.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2010/07]AT30.07.2008
CZ30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
EE30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
RO30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
SK30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
IE21.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2009/45]AT30.07.2008
CZ30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
EE30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
RO30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
SK30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
MC31.01.2009
Former [2009/27]AT30.07.2008
CZ30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
EE30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
RO30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
SK30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
Former [2009/24]AT30.07.2008
CZ30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
EE30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
SK30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
Former [2009/22]AT30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
EE30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
Former [2009/20]AT30.07.2008
DK30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
Former [2009/16]AT30.07.2008
FI30.07.2008
LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
SI30.07.2008
BG30.10.2008
IS30.11.2008
PT30.12.2008
Former [2009/10]LT30.07.2008
NL30.07.2008
IS30.11.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]US5037158  (CRAWFORD JEFF [US]) [A] 1,10* abstract *;
 [A]US6209840  (CHEN CHAO KEN [TW]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 10; figure - *
by applicantUS4749230
 US5393125
 US6394553
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.