Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1565036

EP1565036 - LATE REVERBERATION-BASED SYNTHESIS OF AUDITORY SCENES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/33]Late reverberation-based synthesis of auditory scenes
[2017/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd.
No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7
Singapore 768923 / SG
[2016/06]
Former [2015/30]For all designated states
Agere Systems Inc.
1110 American Parkway, NE
Allentown, PA 18109 / US
Former [2005/33]For all designated states
Agere System Inc.
1110 American Parkway NE
Allentown, PA 18109 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Baumgarte, Frank
395 Ano Nuevo Ave.
Apt. 102
Sunnyvale California 94085 / US
02 / Faller, Christoff
Guetrain 1
8274 Tagerwilen / CH
 [2017/47]
Former [2005/33]01 / Baumgarte, Frank
395 Ano Nuevo Ave. Apt. 102
Sunnyvale California 94085 / US
02 / Faller, Christoff
Guetrain 1
8274 Tagerwilen / CH
Representative(s)Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
[2014/44]
Former [2005/33]Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date05250626.804.02.2005
[2005/33]
Priority number, dateUS20040544287P12.02.2004         Original published format: US 544287 P
US2004081559101.04.2004         Original published format: US 815591
[2005/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1565036
Date:17.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1565036
Date:23.06.2010
[2010/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1565036
Date:22.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04S7/00, H04S3/00, G10L19/008
[2017/30]
Former International [2005/33]H04S3/02, H04S5/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2017/47]
Former [2011/09]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2005/33]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:AUF SPÄTEM NACHHALL BASIERTE SYNTHESE VON HÖRSZENARIEN[2017/38]
English:LATE REVERBERATION-BASED SYNTHESIS OF AUDITORY SCENES[2017/38]
French:SYNTHÈSE DE SCÈNES AUDIO BASÉE SUR RÉVERBÉRATIONS RETARDÉES[2017/38]
Former [2005/33]Auf spätem Nachhall basierte Synthese von Hörszenarien
Former [2005/33]Late reverberation-based synthesis of auditory scenes
Former [2005/33]Synthèse de scènes audio basée sur réverbérations retardées
Examination procedure23.11.2010Examination requested  [2010/52]
15.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.12.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.01.2011Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
18.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2017Fee for grant paid
06.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.12.2010
Opposition(s)23.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB22.02.2018
FR28.02.2018
[2019/12]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO03090208  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 10, line 10 - page 17, line 27 * * figures 1-3 *
 [X]  - FALLER CHRISTOF, "Parametric coding of spatial audio - Thesis No 3062", THESE PRESENTEE A LA FACULTE INFORMATIQUE ET COMMUNICATIONSINSTITUT DE SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION SECTION DES SYSTEMES DECOMMUNICATION ÉCOLE POLYTECHNIQUE FÉDÉRALE DE LAUSANNE POURL'OBTENTION DU GRADE DE DOCTEUR ES SCIENCES, XX, XX, (20040101), page COMPLETE, XP002343263 [X] 1-10 * page 43, paragraph 1 - page 63, paragraph l * * page 93, paragraph 1 - page 106, paragraph l * * figures 4.1,4.2,6.1-6.8 *