EP1580154 - Sheet separation member and sheet supply device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | ||
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asada, Tetsuo c/o Technology Planning & IP Dept Brother Kogyo K.K. 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | 02 /
Shiohara, Yukio c/o Technology Planning & IP Dept Brother Kogyo K.K. 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251295.1 | 04.03.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | JP20040063161 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004063161 | JP20040289140 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004289140 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1580154 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1580154 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/52, B65H3/02 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
B65H3/52 (EP,US);
B65H3/02 (EP,US);
B65H3/5215 (EP,US);
B65H3/56 (EP,US);
B65H2404/551 (EP,US);
B65H2404/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | Bogentrennglied und -zuführvorrichtung | [2005/39] | English: | Sheet separation member and sheet supply device | [2005/39] | French: | Organe de séparation de feuilles et dispositif d'alimentation de feuilles | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.04.2008 | BE | 30.04.2008 | CY | 30.04.2008 | CZ | 30.04.2008 | DK | 30.04.2008 | EE | 30.04.2008 | FI | 30.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | LT | 30.04.2008 | NL | 30.04.2008 | PL | 30.04.2008 | RO | 30.04.2008 | SI | 30.04.2008 | SK | 30.04.2008 | TR | 30.04.2008 | BG | 30.07.2008 | GR | 31.07.2008 | SE | 31.07.2008 | ES | 10.08.2008 | IS | 30.08.2008 | PT | 30.09.2008 | HU | 01.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
GR | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
HU | 01.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
GR | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 30.04.2008 | |
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 30.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06255821 ; | [A]EP1350746 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,7,15-19 * column 8, line 35 - column 11, line 43; figures 2,8a-11b *; | [A]EP1389599 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 1* figures 1,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941212), vol. 018, no. 655, Database accession no. (M - 1721), & JP06255821 A 19940913 (KUREHA CHEM IND CO LTD; others: 01) [A] 1,15 * abstract * |