blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1575044

EP1575044 - Optical disc and disc cartridge containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.05.2009  [2009/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Sony Disc & Digital Solutions Inc.
1-12, Kitashinagawa 5-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Sony Disc & Digital Solutions Inc.
1-12, Kitashinagawa 5-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2007/48]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Sony Disc & Digital Solutions Inc.
1-12, Kitashinagawa 5-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2005/37]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
SONY DISC TECHNOLOGY INC.
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome,Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Masuhara, Shin
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Kishi, Shinsuke, c/o Sony Disc Technology Inc.
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2005/37]
Representative(s)Smith, Samuel Leonard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/37]Smith, Samuel Leonard
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date05251358.707.03.2005
[2005/37]
Priority number, dateJP2004006623709.03.2004         Original published format: JP 2004066237
[2005/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1575044
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1575044
Date:27.12.2006
[2006/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1575044
Date:28.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2006
ClassificationIPC:G11B23/00, G11B23/03, G11B7/24, G11B7/26
[2006/52]
CPC:
G11B23/0308 (EP,US); H04B1/40 (KR); H04W4/10 (KR);
H04W88/02 (KR)
Former IPC [2005/37]G11B7/24, G11B7/26, G11B23/03
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/36]
Former [2005/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Optische Platte und Kassette[2005/37]
English:Optical disc and disc cartridge containing the same[2005/37]
French:Disque optique et cassette la contenant[2005/37]
Examination procedure25.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/28]
21.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.2008Fee for grant paid
02.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0270182  (OPTICAL STORAGE INT [NL]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 11 - column 10, line 43; figure 4 *;
 [DA]JPH09282712  (SONY CORP) [DA] 1* abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.