EP1580958 - Internet protocol tunnelling using templates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/50] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
See, David Kenji 13/13 Belmont Avenue Wollstonecraft New South Wales 2065 / AU | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/39] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251878.4 | 24.03.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | AU20040901658 | 26.03.2004 Original published format: AU 2004901658 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1580958 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1580958 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/46 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04L63/164 (EP,US);
H04L69/12 (EP,US);
H04L69/161 (EP,US);
H04L69/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | Internet Protocol Tunnelling mit Hilfe von Vorlagen | [2005/39] | English: | Internet protocol tunnelling using templates | [2005/39] | French: | Internet protocol tunnelling utilisant des champs pré-définis | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2010 | BE | 15.12.2010 | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | HU | 15.12.2010 | IT | 15.12.2010 | LT | 15.12.2010 | NL | 15.12.2010 | PL | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SE | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | IE | 24.03.2011 | LU | 24.03.2011 | ES | 26.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | FR | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | IS | 15.04.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
TR | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 24.03.2011 | ||
LU | 24.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 24.03.2011 | ||
LU | 24.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 24.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 15.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2002095519 (PHILBRICK CLIVE M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,11,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] *[A] 6,7,10,12,13; | [XA]US2003152078 (HENDERSON ALEX E [US], et al) [X] 1,8,11,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0102] * [A] 2-7,9,10,12,13 | Examination | - "IP Authentication Header", IETF RFC 2402, (199811), XP015008186 |