Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1593400

EP1593400 - Hybrid biologic-synthetic bioabsorbable scaffolds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.05.2011
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.06.2011  [2011/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DePuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw
Indiana 46581 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]For all designated states
Depuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw
Indiana 46581 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Malaviya, Prasanna
3610 Winterfield Run
Fort Wayne, IN 46804 / US
02 / Orban, Janine M.
1012 Country Club Lane
Warsaw, IN 46580 / US
03 / Jenks, Philip J.
411 East High Circle
Warsaw, IN 46580 / US
04 / Whalen, Terrence
4107 E Potawatami Lane
Leesburg, IN 465838 / US
 [2005/50]
Former [2005/45]01 / Malaviya, Prasanna
3610 Winterfield Run
Fort Wayne, IN 46804 / US
02 / Orban, Janine M.
222 Lakeland Drive
Warsaw, IN 46580 / US
03 / Jenks, Philip J.
411 East High Circle
Warsaw, IN 46580 / US
04 / Whalen, Terrence
4107 E Potawatami Lane
Leesburg, IN 465838 / US
Representative(s)Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date05252559.925.04.2005
[2005/45]
Priority number, dateUS20040567886P04.05.2004         Original published format: US 567886 P
[2005/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1593400
Date:09.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/36, A61F2/02
[2005/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/45]
TitleGerman:Biologische/synthetische bioabsorbierbare Hybrid-Gerüste[2005/45]
English:Hybrid biologic-synthetic bioabsorbable scaffolds[2005/45]
French:Structures bioabsorbables hybrides biologiques-synthétiques[2005/45]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/20]
16.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/26]
15.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/26]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.06.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003023316  (BROWN LAURA JEAN ET AL) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0062] * * figures 1-13 * * claim - *;
 [A]WO03007790  (DEPUY PRODUCTS, INC; MALAVIYA, PRASANNA; MELICAN, MORA, C; REZANIA, AL) [A] 1-14 * examples 3,4 * * claim - *;
 [A]US6153292  (BELL ET AL) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 12 - line 33 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 17 * * column 13, line 10 - line 44 * * claim - *